Jackson v. Ace Cash Express et al
Plaintiff: Howard Jackson
Defendant: Deputy Kevin M. Murphy, Susan S. Pressler, Jay B. Shipowitz, Ace Cash Express and F.D.I.C.
Case Number: 0:2019cv01987
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Joan N Ericksen
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(lmb) cc: Howard Jackson.
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re [Docket No. #5 ] Report and Recommendation. 1. This action is dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) as follows: a. All claims grounded in state law are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. b. All claims grounded in federal law brought against the named Defendants are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. 2. Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis [Docket No. #2 ] is DENIED. 3. The Clerk of Court shall terminate Docket No. #3 . (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 9/13/2019. (CBC) cc: Howard Jackson. Modified text on 9/16/2019 (lmb).
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 OBJECTION TO #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION filed by Howard Jackson.(KDS)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Howard Jackson filed by Howard Jackson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 8/15/2019. (DMM) cc: Jackson. (kt)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 EXHIBIT Proof 1-3 re #3 MOTION to Object, Motion to Remove Judge BRT Misconducts Conflict of Interest, Summary Judgment filed by Howard Jackson.(KDS) Document QC'd on 8/8/2019 (NAH).
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Object, Motion to Remove Judge BRT Misconducts Conflict of Interest, Summary Judgment filed by Howard Jackson. (KDS) Document QC'd on 8/8/2019 (NAH).
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Howard Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(kt) Document QC'd on 9/17/2019 (NAH).
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ace Cash Express, Kevin M. Murphy, Susan S. Pressler, Jay B. Shipowitz filed by Howard Jackson. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Doc A, #3 Exhibit(s) Doc B, #4 Exhibit(s) Doc C, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (kt)cc: Jackson. (kt) Document QC'd on 9/17/2019 (NAH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Ace Cash Express et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Kevin M. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan S. Pressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay B. Shipowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace Cash Express
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.D.I.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?