Scher v. Bureau of Prisons et al
Plaintiff: Gregory A. Scher
Defendant: Capt. J. Feda, Bureau of Prisons, FMC Rochester and Lt. Bordt
Case Number: 0:2019cv02001
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Plaintiff's request for the appointment of counsel (Doc. No. 9) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 9/24/2019. (MSK) cc:Gregory A. Scher. Modified text on 9/25/2019 (MMG).
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST for Appointment of Counsel filed by Gregory A. Scher. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MKB)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Bordt, FMC Rochester, J. Feda. (CLK)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Order Granting IFP and USM Forms to Complete cc: Gregory A. Scher. (MMG)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER/NOTICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 9/4/2019. (MSK) cc:Gregory A. Scher. Modified text on 9/5/2019 (MMG).
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 RECEIPT number 34641015670 in the amount of $400.00 issued to Gregory A. Scher. (MMP)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY as to Plaintiff's application to proceed IFP. Plaintiff must pay partial filing fee.Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 8/9/2019. (JGS) cc: Gregory A. Scher. Modified text on 8/12/2019 (lmb).
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER TO THE COURT from Gregory A. Scher. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kt) Modified text on 8/12/2019 (kt). Document QC'd on 8/22/2019 (NAH).
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Gregory A. Scher. (MMP) Document QC'd on 9/17/2019 (NAH).
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Lt. Bordt, Bureau of Prisons, FMC Rochester, Capt. J. Feda filed by Gregory A. Scher. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)cc: Scher. (MMP) Modified text on 7/30/2019 (MMP). Document QC'd on 9/17/2019 (NAH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scher v. Bureau of Prisons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. J. Feda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Rochester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Bordt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory A. Scher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?