Betterton v. Fikes
Petitioner: Darcy J. Betterton
Respondent: Warden Fikes
Case Number: 0:2019cv02005
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Correct Inmate Number by Darcy J. Betterton (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLK)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 OBJECTION TO #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION filed by Darcy J. Betterton. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Inmate Mail Delivery Stamp, #3 Envelope)(CLK) Document QC'd on 9/3/2019 (NAH).
August 22, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK) cc NEF: Betterton. Modified text on 8/23/2019 (KDS).
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Darcy J. Betterton, #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Darcy J. Betterton filed by Darcy J. Betterton. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/7/2019. (KLL) cc: Betterton. Modified text on 8/8/2019 (KDS).
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann M Bildtsen on behalf of Warden Fikes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bildtsen, Ann)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Darcy J. Betterton. (CLK) RESTRICTED PER JUDGE TOSTRUD'S CHAMBERS. (kt) Document QC'd/Modified text on 8/16/2019 (ACH).
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Darcy J. Betterton. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (5th - Prisoner) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) cc NEF: Betterton. (CLK) Document QC'd/Modified text on 8/16/2019 (ACH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Betterton v. Fikes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Fikes
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Lisa D Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Darcy J. Betterton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?