Byrd v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tiba Byrd
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv02042
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Myers, Gregory)
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. filed by Tiba Byrd. No summons requested. (Peterson, Ryan)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE NOTICE AND ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 10/23/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3 (DUL) before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 8/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JLB)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Myers, Gregory)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Craig Sanders for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 8/1/2019. (JGK)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 5th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-2042 SRN/LIB. (KDS)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. re #3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Craig Sanders. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7032637, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, (Myers, Gregory)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Craig Sanders. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7032637 filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Myers, Gregory)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Experian plc is a corporate parent of Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Myers, Gregory)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Itasca County District Court (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7032589) filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Myers, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byrd v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiba Byrd
Represented By: Ryan D. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory J Myers
Represented By: Craig Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?