Harkins v. Smith & Raver, LLP
Plaintiff: Michael John Harkins
Defendant: Smith & Raver, LLP
Case Number: 0:2019cv02054
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Michael John Harkins. Jointly Signed by Michael John Harkins and Smith & Raver, LLP.(Vavreck, Mark)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 8/26/2019. (BJP) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2019: #1 Consent Form) (kt).
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance regarding ANSWER to Complaint filed by Smith & Raver, LLP. (Smith, Morgan)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 Civil Cover Sheet regarding ANSWER to Complaint filed by Smith & Raver, LLP. (Smith, Morgan)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Smith & Raver, LLP. (Smith, Morgan)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Regarding Dispositive Motion Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 8/5/2019. (CLB)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Smith & Raver, LLP. (MMP)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 19-cv-2054 (DSD/KMM). (MMP)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Smith & Raver, LLP (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7033307) filed by Michael John Harkins. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Vavreck, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harkins v. Smith & Raver, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Raver, LLP
Represented By: Morgan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael John Harkins
Represented By: Mark L Vavreck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?