EMCASCO Insurance Company et al v. CWK Technology, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: EMCASCO Insurance Company and Ogilvie Independent School District No. 333
Defendant: Oceanspring Trading, Inc., CWK Technology, Inc. and Amazon.com, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv02061
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE NOTICE AND ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (DUL) before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 9/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JLB)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney William Brendan Murphy for Amazon.com, Inc.; granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Caroline Ayres Teichner for Amazon.com, Inc.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 8/23/2019. (NAH)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Caroline A. Teichner. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7099221 filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Young, Mary)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brendan Murphy. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7099197 filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Young, Mary)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 Amended ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Crowder, Andrew)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 Amazon.com, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Crowder, Andrew)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Matthew D. Pechous as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MMP)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 5th Division Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-2061 (SRN/LIB). (MMP)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amazon.com, Inc. re #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, (Crowder, Andrew)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.. (Crowder, Andrew)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Tenth Judicial District, Kanabec County (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7034583) filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) WA State Business Corporation Records re: CWK Technology, Inc., #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Crowder, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EMCASCO Insurance Company et al v. CWK Technology, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oceanspring Trading, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CWK Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Mary S. Young
Represented By: Andrew Crowder
Represented By: Caroline Ayres Teichner
Represented By: William Brendan Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMCASCO Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin J Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ogilvie Independent School District No. 333
Represented By: Kevin J Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?