Allstate Insurance Company v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Defendant: Kayle Alan Fleischauer, Candace JoMarie Fleischauer and April Lynn Johnson
Case Number: 0:2019cv02068
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Donovan W Frank
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED ORDER setting PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/8/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2019 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/24/2019. (JMK)
September 23, 2019 Filing 17 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Allstate Insurance Company . (Burke, Michael)
September 23, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Allstate Insurance Company re #15 Notice (Other) of Order (Burke, Michael)
September 23, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Allstate Insurance Company re #14 Order/Notice to Attorney,,, (Burke, Michael)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff is directed to: (1) Notify defendant Kayle Alan Fleischauer or his counsel immediately that he is required to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint or submit a stipulation for an extension of time to answer or otherwise plead within ten (10) days of service of the notice; (2) File the notice to defendant Kayle Alan Fleischauer or his counsel in CM/ECF; and (3) If no answer or other pleading is filed by defendant Kayle Alan Fleischauer within ten (10) days of service of the notice, plaintiff shall file an application for entry of default or motion for default within twenty (20) days of the date of this order; or (4) Advise the undersigned in writing of any good cause to the contrary. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this action for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/20/2019. (JMK)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER setting PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/24/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 10/31/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JMK)
August 26, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Candace JoMarie Fleischauer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exh 1 to Def. Candace Fleischauer's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint) (Moran, William)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by William L Moran on behalf of Candace JoMarie Fleischauer. (Moran, William)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for April Lynn Johnson. (Goetz, Frederick)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint Answer of April Lynn Johnson, as trustee for the next-of-kin of Chase Alan Fleischauer, to Complaint for Declaratory Judgment filed by April Lynn Johnson. (Goetz, Frederick)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company. Kayle Alan Fleischauer served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (Burke, Michael)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company. Candace JoMarie Fleischauer served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Burke, Michael)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company. April Lynn Johnson served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Burke, Michael)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. The Allstate Corporation is a corporate parent of Plaintiff Allstate Insurance Company. (Burke, Michael)
August 2, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (KLL)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Candace JoMarie Fleischauer, Kayle Alan Fleischauer, April Lynn Johnson. (MMP)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-2068 (DWF/HB). (MMP)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Burke on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company. (Burke, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Candace JoMarie Fleischauer, Kayle Alan Fleischauer, April Lynn Johnson (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7035899) filed by Allstate Insurance Company. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Redacted Policy, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Complaint in Underlying Action, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wood, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kayle Alan Fleischauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candace JoMarie Fleischauer
Represented By: Kyle Koebele
Represented By: William L Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April Lynn Johnson
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael T. Burke
Represented By: Brian A Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?