Soo Line Railroad Company v. City of Minneapolis et al
Plaintiff: Soo Line Railroad Company
Defendant: Velma J. Korbel, Minneapolis Department of Civil Rights and City of Minneapolis
Case Number: 0:2019cv02093
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Donovan W Frank
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER/NOTICE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/17/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 10/24/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TMA)
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 Joint ANSWER to Complaint filed by City of Minneapolis, Velma J. Korbel, Minneapolis Department of Civil Rights. (McLaren, Sarah)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER on #10 Stipulation,. City of Minneapolis answer or otherwise respond due date 9/9/2019; Velma J. Korbel answer or otherwise respond due date 9/9/2019; Minneapolis Department of Civil Rights answer or otherwise respond due date 9/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/20/2019. (TMA)
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 Stipulation,. (McLaren, Sarah)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Extend Defendants' Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by City of Minneapolis, Velma J. Korbel, Minneapolis Department of Civil Rights. Jointly Signed by Soo Line Railroad Company d/b/a Canadian Pacific. (McLaren, Sarah)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W Davis on behalf of Soo Line Railroad Company. (Davis, Andrew)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah C S McLaren on behalf of All Defendants. (McLaren, Sarah)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Soo Line Railroad Company d/b/a Canadian Pacific states as follows: 1. Soo Line Railroad Company d/b/a Canadian Pacific is an indirect wholly owned subsidiary of Canadian Pacific Railway Limited, a Canadian corporation, which is publicly traded on the New York and Toronto Stock Exchanges. (Donesky, Tracey) Modified text on 8/9/2019 (MMP).
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Soo Line Railroad Company. Velma J. Korbel served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Donesky, Tracey)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Soo Line Railroad Company. Minneapolis Department of Civil Rights served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Donesky, Tracey)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Soo Line Railroad Company. City of Minneapolis served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Donesky, Tracey)
August 7, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Donovan W. Frank's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these practice pointers, in addition to the District of Minnesota's Local Rules and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (las)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to City of Minneapolis, Velma J. Korbel, Minneapolis Department of Civil Rights. (CLK)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-2093 DWF/ECW. (CLK)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Velma J. Korbel, Minneapolis City, Minneapolis Civil Rights Dept (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7039865) filed by Soo Line Railroad Company d/b/a Canadian Pacific. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Donesky, Tracey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soo Line Railroad Company v. City of Minneapolis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velma J. Korbel
Represented By: Sarah C S McLaren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minneapolis Department of Civil Rights
Represented By: Sarah C S McLaren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Minneapolis
Represented By: Sarah C S McLaren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soo Line Railroad Company
Represented By: Tracey Holmes Donesky
Represented By: Daniel Oberdorfer
Represented By: Andrew W Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?