Preferred Controls, Inc. v. Severson et al
Plaintiff: Preferred Controls, Inc.
Defendant: Mitchell Severson, Integrated Process Solutions, Inc. and Walter Pelowski
Case Number: 0:2019cv02147
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 33 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #32 Stipulation. (Tchida, Bryant)
September 27, 2019 Filing 32 STIPULATION for Stay by Preferred Controls, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Preferred Controls, Inc., Mitchell Severson, Walter Pelowski, and Integrated Process Solutions, Inc.. (Tchida, Bryant)
August 29, 2019 Filing 31 (Text-only) NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: Per the request of counsel, the Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Judge Eric C. Tostrud is canceled and will be rescheduled at a later date. (RMM)
August 23, 2019 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Joel O'Malley in Opposition to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Integrated Process Solutions, Inc., Walter Pelowski, Mitchell Severson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-D)(O'Malley, Joel)
August 23, 2019 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Kurt Schneider in Opposition to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Integrated Process Solutions, Inc., Walter Pelowski, Mitchell Severson.(O'Malley, Joel)
August 23, 2019 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Michael Wille in Opposition to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Integrated Process Solutions, Inc., Walter Pelowski, Mitchell Severson.(O'Malley, Joel)
August 23, 2019 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Walter Pelowski in Opposition to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Integrated Process Solutions, Inc., Walter Pelowski, Mitchell Severson.(O'Malley, Joel)
August 23, 2019 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Peter Nelson in Opposition to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Integrated Process Solutions, Inc., Walter Pelowski, Mitchell Severson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-C)(O'Malley, Joel)
August 23, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Integrated Process Solutions, Inc., Walter Pelowski, Mitchell Severson. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(O'Malley, Joel)
August 23, 2019 Filing 24 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #19 MOTION to Stay Discovery and for a Protective Order filed by Mitchell Severson.(O'Malley, Joel)
August 23, 2019 Filing 23 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #19 Motion to Stay filed by Mitchell Severson.(O'Malley, Joel)
August 23, 2019 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Justin M. Braulick in SUPPORT OF #19 MOTION to Stay Discovery and for a Protective Order filed by Mitchell Severson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(O'Malley, Joel)
August 23, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION to Stay Discovery and for a Protective Order filed by Mitchell Severson. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(O'Malley, Joel)
August 23, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #19 MOTION to Stay Discovery and for a Protective Order : Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Judge Eric C. Tostrud. (O'Malley, Joel)
August 23, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Stay Discovery and for a Protective Order filed by Mitchell Severson. (O'Malley, Joel). Added MOTION for Protective Order on 8/26/2019 (kt).
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (Text-only) BRIEFING ORDER: The hearing on Defendants' Motion to Stay shall be heard on 9/5/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Judge Eric C. Tostrud together with Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Defendants' brief in support of their Motion to Stay shall be filed on or before 8/23/2019. Plaintiff's response shall be filed on or before 8/30/2019. Ordered by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 8/12/2019. (RMM)
August 8, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested : Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Judge Eric C. Tostrud. (Tchida, Bryant)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (Text-only) BRIEFING ORDER re: #2 . Responses due by 8/23/2019. Reply due by 8/30/2019. Ordered by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 8/8/2019. (RMM)
August 8, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel D O'Malley on behalf of Integrated Process Solutions, Inc., Walter Pelowski, Mitchell Severson. (O'Malley, Joel)
August 7, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Integrated Process Solutions, Inc., Walter Pelowski, Mitchell Severson. (KDS)
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 6th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-2147 ECT/LIB. (KDS)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Preferred Controls, Inc..(Tchida, Bryant)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 Declaration of Bryant Tchida in Support of #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Preferred Controls, Inc..(Tchida, Bryant)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #7 Sealed Document(s) - #7 Sealed Exhibit K filed by Preferred Controls, Inc..(Tchida, Bryant)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #6 Sealed Document(s) - #6 Sealed Exhibit J filed by Preferred Controls, Inc..(Tchida, Bryant)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #5 Sealed Document(s) - #5 Sealed Exhibit I filed by Preferred Controls, Inc..(Tchida, Bryant)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit K re #4 Declaration in Support, filed by Preferred Controls, Inc..(Tchida, Bryant)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit J re #4 Declaration in Support, filed by Preferred Controls, Inc..(Tchida, Bryant)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit I re #4 Declaration in Support, filed by Preferred Controls, Inc..(Tchida, Bryant)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 Declaration of Harold Desautel in Support of #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Preferred Controls, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-H)(Tchida, Bryant)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Preferred Controls, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Tchida, Bryant)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Preferred Controls, Inc.. (Tchida, Bryant)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7056816) filed by Preferred Controls, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Tchida, Bryant)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Preferred Controls, Inc. v. Severson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Severson
Represented By: Katie M Connolly
Represented By: Jeremy D Robb
Represented By: Joel D O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrated Process Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Katie M Connolly
Represented By: Jeremy D Robb
Represented By: Joel D O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Pelowski
Represented By: Katie M Connolly
Represented By: Jeremy D Robb
Represented By: Joel D O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Preferred Controls, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Oie
Represented By: Bryant D Tchida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?