Pone v. Messerli & Kramer P.A. et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Pone
Defendant: Messerli & Kramer P.A. and Capital One Bank USA, N.A.
Case Number: 0:2019cv02149
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #12 Motion to Dismiss/General. (Stromquist, Matthew)
September 20, 2019 Filing 15 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #12 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Capital One Bank USA, N.A..(Stromquist, Matthew)
September 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General for Failure to State a Claim : Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3A (STP) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (Stromquist, Matthew)
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General for Failure to State a Claim filed by Capital One Bank USA, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Stromquist, Matthew)
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss/General for Failure to State a Claim filed by Capital One Bank USA, N.A.. (Stromquist, Matthew)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Messerli & Kramer P.A.. (Figgins, Katie)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER on #8 Stipulation. Capital One Bank USA, N.A. answer due 9/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 9/3/2019. (JLB)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 Stipulation. (Stromquist, Matthew)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Capital One Bank USA, N.A.. Jointly Signed by Kevin Pone. (Stromquist, Matthew)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Capital One Bank USA, N.A., is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Capital One Financial Corporation. (Stromquist, Matthew) Modified text on 9/3/2019 (MMP).
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew O. Stromquist on behalf of Capital One Bank USA, N.A.. (Stromquist, Matthew)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin Pone. Capital One Bank USA, N.A. served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (Lyons, Thomas)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin Pone. Messerli & Kramer P.A. served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Lyons, Thomas)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Capital One Bank USA, N.A., Messerli & Kramer P.A.. (MMG)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 6th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-2149 NEB/LIB. (MMG)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demanded against Capital One Bank USA, N.A., Messerli & Kramer P.A. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7057351) filed by Kevin Pone. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lyons, Thomas) Modified text on 8/7/2019 (MMG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pone v. Messerli & Kramer P.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Pone
Represented By: Thomas J Lyons, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Messerli & Kramer P.A.
Represented By: Katie Figgins
Represented By: Derrick N Weber
Represented By: Stephanie Shawn Lamphere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Matthew O. Stromquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?