Bank of America, National Association v. Schwingler
Plaintiff: Bank of America, National Association
Defendant: Jon Schwingler
Case Number: 0:2019cv02155
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Kristina Kaluza in Opposition to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Compel Arbitration filed by Bank of America, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Linkedin Page, #2 Exhibit(s) B - FINRA Code, #3 Exhibit(s) C - U-4)(Kaluza, Kristina)
October 3, 2019 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Declaration of Charlanne Dubay in Opposition to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Compel Arbitration filed by Bank of America, National Association.(Kaluza, Kristina)
October 3, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Keith Wagenknecht in Opposition to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Compel Arbitration filed by Bank of America, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1) Schwingler Offer Letter, #2 Exhibit(s) 2) Excerpt of Schwingler Payroll Records)(Kaluza, Kristina)
October 3, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Compel Arbitration filed by Bank of America, National Association. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kaluza, Kristina)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Compel Arbitration. Within 30 days of the motion being decided, Plaintiff shall contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Tony Leung, by letter or e-mail, for the purpose of scheduling the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 9/13/2019. (HAM)
September 13, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Cameron Young on behalf of Jon Schwingler. (Young, Ryan)
September 12, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration #9 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. (Smalley-Fleming, Sandra)
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 Declaration of Jon Schwingler in Support of #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Compel Arbitration filed by Jon Schwingler.(Smalley-Fleming, Sandra)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 Declaration of Sandra Smalley-Fleming in Support of #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Compel Arbitration filed by Jon Schwingler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D)(Smalley-Fleming, Sandra)
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Compel Arbitration filed by Jon Schwingler.(Smalley-Fleming, Sandra)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Compel Arbitration : Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Smalley-Fleming, Sandra)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Compel Arbitration filed by Jon Schwingler. (Smalley-Fleming, Sandra)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on #6 Stipulation. Jon Schwingler answer due 9/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/30/2019. (HAM)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Stipulation. (Smalley-Fleming, Sandra)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,, for Extension of Time to Respond by Jon Schwingler. Jointly Signed by Bank of America, National Association. (Smalley-Fleming, Sandra)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra S Smalley-Fleming on behalf of Jon Schwingler. (Smalley-Fleming, Sandra)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bank of America, National Association. Jon Schwingler served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. (Kaluza, Kristina)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jon Schwingler. (CLK)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-2155 PJS/TNL. (CLK)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jon Schwingler (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7059706) filed by Bank of America, National Association. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - First Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Second Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit(s) C- June 17, 2015 letter, #4 Exhibit(s) D- March 14, 2016 letter, #5 Exhibit(s) E - March 27, 2017 letter, #6 Exhibit(s) F - October 19, 2018 letter, #7 Exhibit(s) G - June 11, 2019 letter, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kaluza, Kristina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, National Association v. Schwingler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Schwingler
Represented By: Sandra S Smalley-Fleming
Represented By: Ryan Cameron Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, National Association
Represented By: Kristina Kaluza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?