Doe v. Minnesota State High School League et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Osseo Area Schools, Independant School District No. 279, Minnesota State High School League and Erich Martens
Case Number: 0:2019cv02162
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 9/20/2019. (KMW)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Beck, Kevin)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Erich Martens, Minnesota State High School League. Jointly Signed by John Doe, Minnesota State High School League, Erich Martens, and Osseo Area Schools, ISD No. 279. (Beck, Kevin)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex D. Ivan on behalf of Osseo Area Schools, Independant School District No. 279. (Ivan, Alex)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER/NOTICE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 10/1/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/1/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 8/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TJB)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Erich Martens, Minnesota State High School League. (Beck, Kevin)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant Osseo Area Schools' ANSWER to Complaint filed by Osseo Area Schools, Independant School District No. 279. (Wallner, Mar-Bon)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Alex D. Ivan as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (KDS)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations, ADA Other list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-2162 NEB/DTS. (KDS)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court, case number 27-cv-19-12354 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7062911) filed by Osseo Area Schools, Independant School District No. 279. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wallner, Mar-Bon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Minnesota State High School League et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osseo Area Schools, Independant School District No. 279
Represented By: Mar-Bon R Wallner
Represented By: Alex D. Ivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota State High School League
Represented By: Kevin M Beck
Represented By: Patrick John Kelly
Represented By: Joseph A Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erich Martens
Represented By: Kevin M Beck
Represented By: Patrick John Kelly
Represented By: Joseph A Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Andrea L Jepsen
Represented By: Amy J Goetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?