Stephens v. Messerli & Kramer PA
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Stephens
Defendant: Messerli & Kramer PA
Case Number: 0:2019cv02207
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Joseph R. Stephens. Jointly Signed by Messerli & Kramer PA.(Cox, Prentiss)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Joseph R. Stephens. (Cox, Prentiss)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER/NOTICE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/8/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 10:30 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 342 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TMA)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Messerli & Kramer PA. (Lamphere, Stephanie)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance for Law Student Chad K. Hermes by Prentiss E Cox on behalf of Joseph R. Stephens. (Cox, Prentiss) Modified text on 8/14/2019 (lmb).
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Messerli & Kramer PA. (KDS)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-2207 NEB/ECW. (KDS)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet to Complaint re #1 Complaint. (Cox, Prentiss) Modified text on 8/13/2019 (KDS).
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Messerli & Kramer, P.A. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7073940) filed by Joseph R. Stephens. Filer requests summons issued. (Cox, Prentiss) Modified text on 8/13/2019 (KDS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephens v. Messerli & Kramer PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Messerli & Kramer PA
Represented By: Katie Figgins
Represented By: Derrick N Weber
Represented By: Stephanie Shawn Lamphere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Stephens
Represented By: Prentiss E Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?