Abdallah v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Mohamed Omar Abdallah
Respondent: Thomas Homan, Kevin McAleenan, William P. Barr, Peter Berg and Kurt Freitag
Case Number: 0:2019cv02211
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER from Clerk's Office to ICE re Order of Remand cc:ICE. (MMG)
October 3, 2019 Filing 14 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal) cc:Mohamed Omar Abdallah(MMG)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE HEREBY ORDERED: This pro se habeas action is dismissed without prejudice and the matter is remanded to Immigration and Customs Enforcement for the immediate release of Petitioner from immigration detention pursuant to an order of supervision with conditions pursuant to 8 C.F.R. 241.5. LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 10/2/2019. (GRR) cc:Mohamed Omar Abdallah. Modified text on 10/3/2019 (MMG). C/C:ICE. Modified text on 10/7/2019 (MMG).
October 1, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William P. Barr, Peter Berg, Thomas Homan, Kevin McAleenan re #10 Response, #11 Proposed Order to Judge - Other (Brooker, Gregory)
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Supplemental Response to Habeas Petition #10 Response. (Brooker, Gregory)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by William P. Barr, Peter Berg, Thomas Homan, Kevin McAleenan. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Brooker, Gregory)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William P. Barr, Peter Berg, Thomas Homan, Kevin McAleenan re #8 Declaration, #6 Response, #7 Declaration (Brooker, Gregory)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Joedie Scott re #6 Response by William P. Barr, Peter Berg, Thomas Homan, Kevin McAleenan . (Brooker, Gregory)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Christopher A. Campbell re #6 Response by William P. Barr, Peter Berg, Thomas Homan, Kevin McAleenan . (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 - 4)(Brooker, Gregory)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by William P. Barr, Peter Berg, Thomas Homan, Kevin McAleenan. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Brooker, Gregory)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory G Brooker on behalf of William P. Barr, Peter Berg, Thomas Homan, Kevin McAleenan. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Brooker, Gregory)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs; denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Respondents to file answer to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus within 20 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 8/26/2019. (JGS) cc: Mohamed Omar Abdallah. Modified text on 8/27/2019 (lmb).
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Mohamed Omar Abdallah. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope)(MMP) Document QC'd 9/11/19 by KMW.
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Mohamed Omar Abdallah. (MMP) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/10/2019 (KMH)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Mohamed Omar Abdallah. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) cc: Abdallah. (MMP) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/10/2019 (KMH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdallah v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Homan
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Gregory G Brooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Gregory G Brooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Gregory G Brooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Peter Berg
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Gregory G Brooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kurt Freitag
Represented By: David John Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mohamed Omar Abdallah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?