Picha et al v. SunTrust Mortgage, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kristy Picha and Ryan Picha
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System (MERS), SunTrust Mortgage, Inc., Northpointe Bank and CMG Mortgage, Inc
Case Number: 0:2019cv02240
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #9 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Plaintiffs' Motion to Quash Process of Removal, to Strike, Overrule, and Deny Defendants' Motion to Remove and to Remand to the State to Proceed Regarding Substantive and Common Law Jural Rights Protections #6 is DENIED.(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 10/9/2019. (GRR)
October 3, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SunTrust Mortgage, Inc. re #12 Response to Objection to Report and Recommendation (Brandt, Angela)
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO OBJECTION to #10 Report and Recommendation filed by SunTrust Mortgage, Inc. filed by SunTrust Mortgage, Inc..(Brandt, Angela)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Strike, Overrule, and Deny R&R and Motion to Remand filed by Kristy Picha, Ryan Picha. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MKB) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/2/2019 (KMH).
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 OBJECTION TO #9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION filed by Kristy Picha, Ryan Picha.(MKB) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/2/2019 (KMH).
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #6 MOTION to Quash filed by Ryan Picha. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 9/10/2019. (KAR)cc: cc: Kristy Picha, Ryan Picha. Modified text on 9/11/2019 (MMP).
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING #6 MOTION to Quash filed by Ryan Picha to Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 8/30/2019. (GRR) cc: Kristy Picha, Ryan Picha. Modified text on 8/30/2019 (lmb).
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Quash filed by SunTrust Mortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Affidavit of Service)(Brandt, Angela)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO QUASH PROCESS OF REMOVAL, TO STRIKE, OVERRULE, AND DENY DEFENDANTS MOTION TO REMOVE AND TO REMAND TO THE STATE TO PROCEED REGARDING SUBSTANTIVE AND COMMON LAW JURAL RIGHTS PROTECTIONS filed by Ryan Picha. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMG) Document QC'd on 8/29/2019 (JGK).
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Northpointe Bank re #4 Notice of Appearance, #3 Notice of Appearance (Sauer, Michael)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric D Cook on behalf of Northpointe Bank. (Cook, Eric)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R Sauer on behalf of Northpointe Bank. (Sauer, Michael)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-2240 (MJD/DTS). (lmb) cc: NEF and copy of docket sheet mailed to Ryan and Kristy Picha. Modified text on 8/14/2019 (lmb).
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Anoka County District Court, case number 02-cv-19-3428 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7079002) filed by SunTrust Mortgage, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Affidavit of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Brandt, Angela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Picha et al v. SunTrust Mortgage, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System (MERS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunTrust Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Angela Beranek Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northpointe Bank
Represented By: Eric D Cook
Represented By: Michael R Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMG Mortgage, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristy Picha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Picha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?