Bol Gai v. Barr
Petitioner: Obec Benjamin Bol Gai
Respondent: William P. Barr
Case Number: 0:2019cv02269
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William P. Barr re #11 Response, #12 Declaration (Siekert, Friedrich)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Richard N. Pryd Jr. re #11 Response by William P. Barr . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Siekert, Friedrich)
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by William P. Barr. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Siekert, Friedrich)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #9 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/5/2019. (JMK) cc: Obec Benjamin Bol Gai. Modified text on 9/5/2019 (MMP).
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL filed by Obec Benjamin Bol Gai. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/10/2019 (KMH).
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs; Respondent to file answer within 20 days of this Order; denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/23/2019. (JMK) cc: Obec Benjamin Bol Gai. Modified text on 8/26/2019 (MMP).
August 23, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK) cc: Obec Benjamin Bol Gai along with a copy of HB's Practice Pointers. Modified text on 8/26/2019 (MMP).
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Friedrich A. P. Siekert on behalf of William P. Barr. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Siekert, Friedrich)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Jeremiah Okany Alaye Nyikew re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Obec Benjamin Bol Gai. (lmb) Modified text QC'd by KMW on 9/10/2019.
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Afeing Shol re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Obec Benjamin Bol Gai. (lmb) Document QC'd by KMW on 9/10/19.
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Bolus Andre Dimbiti re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Obec Benjamin Bol Gai. (lmb) Document QC'd by KMW on 9/10/19.
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Obec Benjamin Bol Gai. (lmb) Document QC'd by KMW on 9/10/19.
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Obec Benjamin Bol Gai. (lmb) Document QC'd by KMW on 9/10/19.
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Obec Benjamin Bol Gai. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (3rd, 4th - Prisoner) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (lmb) cc: Obec Benjamin Bol Gai. Document QC'd by KMW on 9/10/19.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bol Gai v. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Obec Benjamin Bol Gai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Friedrich A. P. Siekert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?