Kremer v. Fikes
Petitioner: Gary Eldred Kremer
Respondent: Warden Fikes
Case Number: 0:2019cv02277
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Gary Eldred Kremer filed by Gary Eldred Kremer, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Gary Eldred Kremer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/11/2019. (TMA). cc: Kremer. Modified text on 9/12/2019 (MTP).
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Fikes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kirkpatrick, Lisa)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Gary Eldred Kremer. (lmb) Document QC'd on 9/10/2019 (KMW).
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Gary Eldred Kremer. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per Civil (5th - Prisoner) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lmb) cc: Gary Eldred Kremer. Document QC'd on 9/10/2019 (KMW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kremer v. Fikes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Fikes
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Lisa D Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gary Eldred Kremer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?