CH Robinson Worldwide, Inc. v. House of Thaller, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: CH Robinson Worldwide, Inc.
Defendant: House of Thaller, Inc., John Thaller, Jordan Thaller and Wes Thaller
Case Number: 0:2019cv02292
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 21 Second AFFIDAVIT in Support re #20 Reply to Response to Motion, TO DISMISS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex 1 to Jordan T. Decl, #2 Exhibit(s) Ex 2 to Jordan T. Decl, #3 Exhibit(s) Ex 3 to Jordan T. Decl)(Meyer, Mathew)
October 4, 2019 Filing 20 Reply to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by John Thaller, Jordan Thaller, Wes Thaller. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Certificate of Compliance)(Meyer, Mathew)
September 20, 2019 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Timothy W. Fafinski in Opposition to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by CH Robinson Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A)(Florea, Adina)
September 20, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Meghan Martland in Opposition to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by CH Robinson Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit B)(Florea, Adina)
September 20, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by CH Robinson Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Florea, Adina)
September 20, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by CH Robinson Worldwide, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B) (Florea, Adina)
September 19, 2019 Filing 15 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. TO BE REFILED. AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by CH Robinson Worldwide, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A redacted, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B) (Florea, Adina) Modified text on 9/20/2019 (CLK).
August 30, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by John Thaller, Jordan Thaller, Wes Thaller. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Certificate of Compliance)(Meyer, Mathew)
August 30, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Adina R Florea on behalf of CH Robinson Worldwide, Inc.. (Florea, Adina)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss/General . Within 30 days of the motion being decided, Plaintiff shall contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Tony Leung, by letter or e-mail, for the purpose of scheduling the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/27/2019. (HAM)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by John Thaller, Jordan Thaller, Wes Thaller.(Meyer, Mathew)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #5 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Motion to Dismiss/General filed by John Thaller, Jordan Thaller, Wes Thaller.(Meyer, Mathew)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 Declaration of Jordan Thaller in Support of #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by John Thaller, Jordan Thaller, Wes Thaller.(Meyer, Mathew)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 Declaration of Wes Thaller in Support of #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by John Thaller, Jordan Thaller, Wes Thaller.(Meyer, Mathew)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 Declaration of John Thaller in Support of #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by John Thaller, Jordan Thaller, Wes Thaller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1 to Declaration of John Thaller, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2 to Declaration of John Thaller)(Meyer, Mathew)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS (Meyer, Mathew)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by John Thaller, Jordan Thaller, Wes Thaller. (Meyer, Mathew)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-2292 (NEB/TNL). (lmb)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal. (Meyer, Mathew) Modified text on 8/20/2019 (lmb).
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Jordan Thaller's ANSWER to Complaint filed by Jordan Thaller. (Meyer, Mathew)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Carver County, First Judicial District, case number 12344218 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7090291) filed by Jordan Thaller, Wes Thaller, John Thaller. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal (Complaint), #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal (Jordan T. Answer), #3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal (AckService Wes T.), #4 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal (AckServ John T.)) (Meyer, Mathew) Modified text on 8/20/2019 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CH Robinson Worldwide, Inc. v. House of Thaller, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CH Robinson Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy W Fafinski
Represented By: Adina R Florea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: House of Thaller, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Thaller
Represented By: Mathew M Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Thaller
Represented By: Mathew M Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wes Thaller
Represented By: Mathew M Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?