Jackson et al v. Wells Fargo et al
Plaintiff: Blue4dprint, Inc., Dana D Jackson and Jackson Americas Srvcs, LLC
Defendant: Wells Fargo, Jackson American Srvcs, LLC and Plaza Services, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv02326
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASE. That 19-cv-2694 (PAM/KMM) has been reassigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel and Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 10/17/2019 and Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 10/21/2019. (lmb)
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by Dana D Jackson. (MTP)
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF LAWSUIT AND REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service for Defendant Plaza Services LLC. Documents have been mailed to all listed defendants: Order Granting IFP, Complaint, two Waiver of Services (AO 399), and one Prepaid Envelope. Waiver of Service due by 11/18/2019. (kt)
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 10/9/2019. (MSK)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying as moot #6 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 10/9/2019. (MSK)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Dana D Jackson. (lmb) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/23/2019 (KMH).
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION REQUESTING SERVICE ON DEFENDANTS filed by Dana D Jackson. (kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/26/2019 (KMH).
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Plaza Services, LLC, Wells Fargo filed by Dana D Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/26/2019 (KMH).
September 5, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #1 Complaint: Rescanned to include missing page. (kt)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. The Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, #2 (IFP Application), is GRANTED with respect to Plaintiff Dana D. Jackson, and DENIED with respect to all other Plaintiffs. Plaintiffs' request for injunctive relief, [3,] is DENIED. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 8/27/2019. cc: Jackson. (KMW) Modified text on 8/28/2019 (CLK).
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Dana D Jackson. (kt)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Dana D Jackson. (kt)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Dana D Jackson. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Housing/Accomodations/ADA Other list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kt)cc: Jackson. (kt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. Wells Fargo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson American Srvcs, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plaza Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue4dprint, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana D Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson Americas Srvcs, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?