Ellometer, LLC v. Steven's Living Trust et al
Plaintiff: Ellometer, LLC
Defendant: Steven's Living Trust, 27th & University, LLP, Scott Richards 27th, University, LLC and Paul Richards University and 27th, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv02331
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Steven E Rau
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 40:875
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint filed by 27th & University, LLP, Paul Richards University and 27th, LLC, Scott Richards 27th, University, LLC, Steven's Living Trust. (Lulic, Joseph)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph F Lulic on behalf of All Defendants. (Lulic, Joseph)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristi K Brownson on behalf of All Defendants. (Brownson, Kristi)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ellometer, LLC (Keenan, Charles)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Text-only) ORDER on #4 Stipulation. 27th & University, LLP answer due 9/21/2019; Paul Richards University and 27th, LLC answer due 9/21/2019; Scott Richards 27th, University, LLC answer due 9/21/2019; Steven's Living Trust answer due 9/21/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 9/16/2019. (MME)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ellometer, LLC. Scott Richards 27th, University, LLC served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Keenan, Charles)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ellometer, LLC. Steven's Living Trust served on 8/24/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Keenan, Charles)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 Stipulation. (Keenan, Charles)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint by Ellometer, LLC. Jointly Signed by Stevens Living Trust, 27th & University, LLP, Scott Richards 27th, University, LLC, and Paul Richards University and 27th, LLC. (Keenan, Charles)
August 23, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to 27th & University, LLP, Paul Richards University and 27th, LLC, Scott Richards 27th, University, LLC, Steven's Living Trust. (MMP)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 19-cv-2331 (WMW/SER). (MMP)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7101355) filed by Ellometer, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Keenan, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellometer, LLC v. Steven's Living Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven's Living Trust
Represented By: Kristi K Brownson
Represented By: Joseph F Lulic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 27th & University, LLP
Represented By: Kristi K Brownson
Represented By: Joseph F Lulic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Richards 27th, University, LLC
Represented By: Kristi K Brownson
Represented By: Joseph F Lulic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Richards University and 27th, LLC
Represented By: Kristi K Brownson
Represented By: Joseph F Lulic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellometer, LLC
Represented By: Charles Edward Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?