Arvidson et al v. MidWestOne Bank
Plaintiff: Sheryl Carlson, Shawna Arvidson and Kimberly Stoffel
Defendant: MidWestOne Bank
Case Number: 0:2019cv02336
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Steven E Rau
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Shawna Arvidson, Sheryl Carlson, Kimberly Stoffel.(Eken, Aaron)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE/CIVIL COVER SHEET WITH UPDATED DEMAND by Shawna Arvidson, Sheryl Carlson, Kimberly Stoffel (Eken, Aaron) Modified text on 9/20/2019 (CLK).
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan E Stokes on behalf of MidWestOne Bank. (Stokes, Susan)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER/NOTICE OF PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report, Rule 26 Worksheet, and confidential settlement letters due by 10/17/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 10/24/2019 at 11:00 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 346 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 9/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MME)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 19-cv-2336 PJS/SER. (kt)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MidWestOne Bank. (Wood, Brian)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint filed by MidWestOne Bank. (Wood, Brian)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7102010) filed by MidWestOne Bank. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit(s) A-S&C, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wood, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arvidson et al v. MidWestOne Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl Carlson
Represented By: Aaron S Eken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawna Arvidson
Represented By: Aaron S Eken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Stoffel
Represented By: Aaron S Eken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MidWestOne Bank
Represented By: Brian A Wood
Represented By: Susan E Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?