Borrego Solar Systems, Inc. v. Oxbow Solar Professionals, Inc.
Plaintiff: Borrego Solar Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Oxbow Solar Professionals, Inc. dba Sunworks, Morgan Charles Thomas Southard and Oxbow Solar Professionals, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv02338
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED ANSWER with Jury Demand to Plaintiff's Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Borrego Solar Systems, Inc.. filed by Oxbow Solar Professionals, Inc.. (Lee-O'Halloran, Patrick)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER/NOTICE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 12/3/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/3/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 12/10/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 10/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TJB)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint filed by Oxbow Solar Professionals, Inc., Morgan Charles Thomas Southard. (Lee-O'Halloran, Patrick)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J Lee-O'Halloran on behalf of All Defendants. (Lee-O'Halloran, Patrick)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Borrego Solar Systems, Inc. re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, Service on Morgan Charles Thomas Southard (Doerr, Sarah)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Borrego Solar Systems, Inc. re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, Service on Oxbow Solar Professionals, Inc. dba Oxbow Sunworks (Doerr, Sarah)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Richard E. Elder for Borrego Solar Systems, Inc.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 8/30/2019. (NAH)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Laura Lee Gildengorin for Borrego Solar Systems, Inc. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 8/29/2019. (JGK)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Laura L. Gildengorin. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7110601 filed by Borrego Solar Systems, Inc.. (Doerr, Sarah)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Richard E. Elder. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7110573 filed by Borrego Solar Systems, Inc.. (Doerr, Sarah)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E Doerr on behalf of Borrego Solar Systems, Inc.. (Doerr, Sarah)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Oxbow Solar Professionals, Inc., Morgan Charles Thomas Southard. (MMP)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-2338 (ECT/DTS). (MMP)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Oxbow Solar Professionals, Inc., Morgan Charles Thomas Southard (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-7102740) filed by Borrego Solar Systems, Inc. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Mechanics Lien Statements, #2 Exhibit(s) Mechanics Lien Statements, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dean, Aaron) Modified text on 8/26/2019 (CLK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Borrego Solar Systems, Inc. v. Oxbow Solar Professionals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxbow Solar Professionals, Inc. dba Sunworks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Charles Thomas Southard
Represented By: Patrick J Lee-O'Halloran
Represented By: Jennifer A Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxbow Solar Professionals, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick J Lee-O'Halloran
Represented By: Jennifer A Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Borrego Solar Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron A Dean
Represented By: Richard E. Elder
Represented By: Sarah E Doerr
Represented By: Laura Lee Gildengorin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?