Brooks v. Toro Company, The
Plaintiff: William Brooks
Defendant: Toro Company, The and Toro International, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv02345
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Paul A Magnuson
2 Judge: Becky R Thorson
3 Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #41 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kenneth A Wexler for William Brooks; granting #42 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Mark Tamblyn for William Brooks. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 2/4/2020. (NAH)
February 3, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark J. Tamblyn. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7449377 filed by William Brooks. (Williams, Amanda)
February 3, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kenneth A. Wexler. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7449368 filed by William Brooks. (Williams, Amanda)
January 31, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7D (STP) before Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (Fisher, Heidi)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #38 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James Joseph Pepper for William Brooks. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 1/29/2020. (NAH)
January 28, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James J. Pepper. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7434904 filed by William Brooks. (Williams, Amanda)
January 21, 2020 Filing 37 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Kenneth A. Wexler, Mark J. Tamblyn, James Pepper as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (lmb)
January 17, 2020 Filing 36 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Toro Company, The. filed by William Brooks. No summons requested. (Williams, Amanda)
January 16, 2020 Filing 35 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery Plan and Non-Dispositive Motions are split into Phase One and Phase Two as follows: Discovery Cut-Off Phase One: August 1, 2020 Fact; September 1, 2020 Expert; Discovery Cut-Off Phase Two:February 1, 2021 Fact; April 1, 2021 - Expert. Non-Dispositive Motions Phase One: September 1, 2020; Non-Dispositive Motions Phase Two: April 1, 2021. Dispositive Motions Phase One: November 1, 2020; Dispositive Motions Phase Two: May 1, 2021. Ready for Jury Trial by July 1, 2021. Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 1/16/2020. Associated Cases: 0:19-cv-02294-PAM-BRT, 0:19-cv-02345-PAM-BRT(LLM)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting (30) Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings in case 0:19-cv-02294-PAM-BRT; granting (28) Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings in case 0:19-cv-02345-PAM-BRT. The Court orally granted these motions at the Rule 16 scheduling conference. Plaintiffs are to file their amended pleadings as a new filing. Entered by Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 1/16/2020. Associated Cases: 0:19-cv-02294-PAM-BRT, 0:19-cv-02345-PAM-BRT(ALT)
January 15, 2020 Filing 33 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #28 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings (Combined Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint) filed by William Brooks.(Williams, Amanda)
January 15, 2020 Filing 32 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #28 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings filed by William Brooks.(Williams, Amanda)
January 15, 2020 Filing 31 Declaration of Amanda M. Williams in Support of #28 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings (Combined Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint) filed by William Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-D)(Williams, Amanda)
January 15, 2020 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Support re #28 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings (Combined Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint) filed by William Brooks. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Williams, Amanda)
January 15, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #28 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings (Combined Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint) : Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Williams, Amanda)
January 15, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings (Combined Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint) filed by William Brooks. (Williams, Amanda)
January 9, 2020 Filing 27 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by William Brooks. Jointly Signed by The Toro Company and Toro International, Inc..(Williams, Amanda)
December 19, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Pretrial Conference set for Thursday, January 16, 2020 at 11:30 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 734 (STP) before The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson. (LLM)
December 18, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Toro Company, The, Toro International, Inc.. (Fisher, Heidi)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting in part and denying in part (16) Motion to Dismiss/General; denying (16) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in case 0:19-cv-02294-PAM-BRT; granting in part and denying in part (14) Motion to Dismiss/General; granting (14) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in case 0:19-cv-02345-PAM-BRT.(Written Opinion.) Signed by Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 12/4/2019.(ALT)
November 22, 2019 Filing 23 **TEXT ONLY ENTRY** Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Magnuson: Motion Hearing held on 11/22/2019 re #14 MOTION to Dismiss/General the Complaint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Motion to Strike the Class Allegations filed by Toro Company, The, Toro International, Inc., argued, taken under advisement. Present: Heidi Fisher, Ellie Barragray, Andrew Hansen for Defendant; Amanda Williams for Plaintiff. (ct30min) (Court Reporter Renee Rogge) (LLM)
November 12, 2019 Filing 22 **TEXT ONLY ENTRY** NOTICE of Resetting of Motions Hearing: #15 #14 MOTIONS to Dismiss/General: Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2019 RESET to 11/22/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7D (STP) before Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (LLM)
November 4, 2019 Filing 21 Reply to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss/General the Complaint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Motion to Strike the Class Allegations filed by Toro Company, The, Toro International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Fisher, Heidi)
October 28, 2019 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Amanda M. Williams in Opposition to #14 MOTION to Dismiss/General the Complaint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Motion to Strike the Class Allegations filed by William Brooks.(Williams, Amanda)
October 28, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss/General the Complaint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Motion to Strike the Class Allegations filed by William Brooks. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Williams, Amanda)
October 7, 2019 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, to Strike the Class Allegations, and for Partial Summary Judgment #14 Motion to Dismiss/General, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Fisher, Heidi)
October 7, 2019 Filing 17 Declaration of John Hurst in Support of #14 MOTION to Dismiss/General the Complaint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Motion to Strike the Class Allegations filed by Toro Company, The, Toro International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Fisher, Heidi)
October 7, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss/General the Complaint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Motion to Strike the Class Allegations filed by Toro Company, The, Toro International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Fisher, Heidi)
October 7, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #14 MOTION to Dismiss/General the Complaint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Motion to Strike the Class Allegations : Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7D (STP) before Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (Fisher, Heidi)
October 7, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss/General the Complaint, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Motion to Strike the Class Allegations filed by Toro Company, The, Toro International, Inc.. (Fisher, Heidi)
September 11, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7D (STP) before Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (Fisher, Heidi)
September 11, 2019 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendants Toro Company, The, Toro International, Inc.. (Fisher, Heidi)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED ORDER: In re dispositive motion practice in cases assigned to Judge Magnuson, signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on October 1, 2014. (JEP)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson and Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-2345 PAM/BRT. Signed by Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 8/27/2019 and Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 8/28/19. (CLK)
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Brooks. Toro Company, The served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019; Toro International, Inc. served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Williams, Amanda)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Richard M Paul, III for William Brooks; granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ashlea Schwarz for William Brooks; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Sean R Cooper for William Brooks. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/28/2019. (NAH)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sean R. Cooper. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7110203 filed by William Brooks. (Williams, Amanda)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ashlea G. Schwarz. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7108869 filed by William Brooks. (Williams, Amanda)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Richard M. Paul III. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7108854 filed by William Brooks. (Williams, Amanda)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Richard M. Paul III, Ashlea G. Schwarz, Sean R. Cooper as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (CLK)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Toro Company, The, Toro International, Inc. (CLK)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-2345 NEB/ECW. (CLK)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Toro Company, Toro International, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7104437) filed by William Brooks. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Williams, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Toro Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toro Company, The
Represented By: Heidi A O Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toro International, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew S Hansen
Represented By: Randall J Pattee
Represented By: Heidi A O Fisher
Represented By: Ellie J Barragry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Brooks
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Richard M Paul, III
Represented By: Ashlea Schwarz
Represented By: Sean R Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?