Ahlgren v. Fejes et al
Plaintiff: Erik A. Ahlgren
Defendant: Samuel Fejes and Fejes Guide Services, Ltd.
Case Number: 0:2019cv02385
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Michael J Davis
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on #7 Stipulation. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 10/11/2019. (JLB)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 Stipulation. (Ahlgren, Erik)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION on Discovery and Briefing Related to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Erik A. Ahlgren. Jointly Signed by Samuel Fejes and Fejes Guide Services, Ltd.. (Ahlgren, Erik)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. Case reassigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim. Judge Michael J. Davis no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-2385 JRT/LIB. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 9/4/2019 and Judge Michael J. Davis on 9/5/2019. (CLK)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney William H Ingaldson for Samuel Fejes and for Fejes Guide Services, Ltd. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 8/30/2019. (NAH)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William Ingaldson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7115301 filed by Samuel Fejes, Fejes Guide Services, Ltd.. (Asmus, Jason)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per Civil (6th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-2385 MJD/LIB. (CLK)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Samuel Fejes, Fejes Guide Services, Ltd. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Chandler, Adam)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County of Grant (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7114400) filed by Fejes Guide Services, Ltd., Samuel Fejes. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint Exhibit A, #2 Summons and Complaint Amended - Exhibit B, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Chandler, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahlgren v. Fejes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Fejes
Represented By: Mark G Schroeder
Represented By: Adam Gregory Chandler
Represented By: Jason R Asmus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fejes Guide Services, Ltd.
Represented By: Mark G Schroeder
Represented By: Adam Gregory Chandler
Represented By: Jason R Asmus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik A. Ahlgren
Represented By: Erik A Ahlgren
Represented By: Dorothy Patrias Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?