Maldonado-Maldonado v. Cole et al
Petitioner: Jose Maldonado-Maldonado
Respondent: Federal Prison Camp-Duluth and D. Cole
Case Number: 0:2019cv02402
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by D. Cole, Federal Prison Camp-Duluth re #8 Declaration, #7 Response (Blumenfield, Chad)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Tawana Ingram re #7 Response by D. Cole, Federal Prison Camp-Duluth . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G)(Blumenfield, Chad)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by D. Cole, Federal Prison Camp-Duluth. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Blumenfield, Chad)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad A Blumenfield on behalf of D. Cole, Federal Prison Camp-Duluth. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Blumenfield, Chad)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Respondent(s) to file answer within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 9/9/2019. (KAT) cc: Maldonado-Maldonado. Modified text on 9/10/2019 (MKB).
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jose Maldonado-Maldonado re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Jose Maldonado-Maldonado, #3 Memorandum (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KDS) Document QC'd on 9/4/2019 (MKB).
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jose Maldonado-Maldonado.(KDS) QC'd Document on 9/4/2019 (MKB).
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Jose Maldonado-Maldonado. (KDS) QC'd Document on 9/4/2019 (MKB).
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jose Maldonado-Maldonado. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (5th - Prisoner) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5) (KDS)cc: Maldonado-Maldonado. Modified text on 9/3/2019 (KDS). QC'd on 9/4/2019 (MKB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maldonado-Maldonado v. Cole et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Federal Prison Camp-Duluth
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Chad A Blumenfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: D. Cole
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Chad A Blumenfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Maldonado-Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?