Virtue v. Birkholz
Petitioner: Joel John Virtue
Respondent: Warden B. Birkholz
Case Number: 0:2019cv02403
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Joel John Virtue. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 10/22/2019. (TJB)
October 3, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by B. Birkholz re #13 Declaration, #12 Status Report (Tweeten, Andrew)
October 3, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Shannon Boldt re #12 Status Report by B. Birkholz . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Tweeten, Andrew)
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 STATUS REPORT by B. Birkholz. (Tweeten, Andrew)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Strike Pleading #9 Declaration, #8 Response filed by Joel John Virtue. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLK) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/16/2019 (KMH).
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by B. Birkholz re #9 Declaration, #8 Response (Tweeten, Andrew)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Kyia Winger re #8 Response by B. Birkholz . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Tweeten, Andrew)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE by B. Birkholz re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, . (Tweeten, Andrew)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Expedite Review filed by Joel John Virtue. (CLK) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/25/2019 (KMH).
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by B. Birkholz re #4 Request, #5 Proposed Order to Judge - Other (Tweeten, Andrew)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 Request. (Tweeten, Andrew)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST for Extension of Time to Respond by B. Birkholz. (Tweeten, Andrew)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Tweeten on behalf of B. Birkholz. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tweeten, Andrew)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO ANSWER. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 9/4/2019. (TJB) cc: Joel John Virtue on 9/5/2019 (KNK).
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing fee $5, receipt number 104460) filed by Joel John Virtue. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (5th - Prisoner) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)cc NEF: Virtue (CLK) Modified text on 9/3/2019 (CLK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Virtue v. Birkholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joel John Virtue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden B. Birkholz
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Andrew Tweeten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?