Howard v. Gardner et al
Petitioner: Joseph Howard
Respondent: Brian D. Gardner and Linn County, Iowa
Case Number: 0:2019cv02418
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 NOTICE: The case has been transferred/extracted to the Northern District of Iowa. (MTP)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Transferring this petition to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Iowa. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 10/1/2019. (SMD) cc: Howard. Modified text on 10/4/2019 (MTP).
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re FINDING OF FACT. (JGK) Document QC'd on 9/18/2019 (JGK).
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing fee $5, receipt number 3-15686) filed by Joseph Howard. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (JGK) cc: Howard. Document QC'd on 9/18/2019 (JGK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Gardner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian D. Gardner
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Linn County, Iowa
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?