A.K.B. et al v. Independent School District 194 et al
Plaintiff: Kenyatta Bowen, Marquetta Silva and A.K.B.
Defendant: Independent School District 194 and Debra Murphy
Case Number: 0:2019cv02421
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Richard Student in OPPOSITION TO #10 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by A.K.B., Kenyatta Bowen, Marquetta Silva. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Student, Richard)
October 22, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by A.K.B., Kenyatta Bowen, Marquetta Silva. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Student, Richard)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Joint Motion Regarding Continued Sealing. Permanent Sealing GRANTED for Document Number(s): 11, 14, 14-1, 14-2, and 14-3. Order on continued sealing becomes final on 11/18/2019 unless further timely submissions are filed. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 10/21/2019. (BJP)
October 18, 2019 Filing 19 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #11 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #12 Redacted Document, #15 Statement instead of Redacted Document - Entire Document Confidential/Impracticable to Redact, #14 Exhibit, filed by Independent School District 194. (De Medeiros, Joao)
October 1, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #10 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for 11/25/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Fredrickson, Mark)
October 1, 2019 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Independent School District 194, Debra Murphy.(Fredrickson, Mark)
October 1, 2019 Filing 16 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #10 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Independent School District 194, Debra Murphy.(Fredrickson, Mark)
October 1, 2019 Filing 15 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #14 Sealed Document(s) - #14 Sealed Exhibit 1, [14-1] Sealed Exhibit 2, [14-2] Sealed Exhibit 3, [14-3] Sealed Exhibit 4 filed by Independent School District 194, Debra Murphy.(Fredrickson, Mark)
October 1, 2019 Filing 14 SEALED EXHIBIT Sealed Exhibit 1 re #13 Affidavit in Support of Motion filed by Independent School District 194 and Debra Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 4)(Fredrickson, Mark)
October 1, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Joao C.J.G. de Medeiros in SUPPORT OF #10 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Independent School District 194, Debra Murphy.(Fredrickson, Mark)
October 1, 2019 Filing 12 Redacted Document for #11 Sealed Memorandum of Law in Support of Joint Motion to Dismiss filed by Independent School District 194, Debra Murphy. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Fredrickson, Mark)
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Independent School District 194 and Debra Murphy. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Fredrickson, Mark)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Independent School District 194, Debra Murphy. (Fredrickson, Mark)
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A Fredrickson on behalf of Independent School District 194. (Fredrickson, Mark)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Debra Murphy. (Ferguson, Sally)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by A.K.B.. Debra Murphy served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. (Student, Richard)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by A.K.B.. Independent School District 194 served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. (Student, Richard)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Independent School District 194, Debra Murphy. (MMP)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Housing/Accomodations/ADA Other list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 19-cv-2421 (SRN/KMM). (MMP)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard E Student on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Student, Richard)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Richard Student re #1 Complaint (Affidavit of Expert Review) byA.K.B.. (Student, Richard)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7121237) filed by A.K.B.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Student, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.K.B. et al v. Independent School District 194 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independent School District 194
Represented By: Mark A Fredrickson
Represented By: Joao C.J.G. De Medeiros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Murphy
Represented By: Sally J Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenyatta Bowen
Represented By: Steven J Meshbesher
Represented By: Richard E Student
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquetta Silva
Represented By: Steven J Meshbesher
Represented By: Richard E Student
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.K.B.
Represented By: Richard E Student
Represented By: Steven J Meshbesher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?