Harris v. Janssen
Petitioner: Benjamin Lee Harris and Benjamin L. Harris
Respondent: Vicki Janssen
Case Number: 0:2019cv02428
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal, #2 Appeal Packet)(lmb)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: the Report and Recommendation #5 is ACCEPTED, this matter is DISMISSED, Petitioner's application to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is DENIED AS MOOT, and no certificate of appealability will issue. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 10/7/2019. (RMM)
September 26, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs: Rescanned Application to include p. 3. (KMH)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Benjamin L. Harris, #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Benjamin Lee Harris filed by Benjamin L. Harris. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 9/10/2019. (TJB) cc:Benjamin L. Harris. Modified text on 9/11/2019 (MMG).
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Benjamin Lee Harris re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Benjamin Lee Harris (JGK) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/26/2019 (KMH).
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,. (JGK) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/26/2019 (KMH).
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Benjamin Lee Harris. (JGK) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2019: #1 Rescanned IFP Application) (KMH). Document QC'd by KMH on 9/26/2019 (KMH).
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Benjamin Lee Harris. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (JGK) cc: Harris. Document QC'd by KMH on 9/26/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Janssen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Vicki Janssen
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Benjamin Lee Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Benjamin L. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?