Hussein v. Department of Employment & Economic Development et al
Plaintiff: Gamada A. Hussein
Defendant: John Does, Steve Grove and Department of Employment & Economic Development
Case Number: 0:2019cv02469
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Becky R Thorson
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2003
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(MMP)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 OPINION AND ORDER granting #5 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. See Order for specifics. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 10/7/2019. (RMM)
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Department of Employment & Economic Development, Steve Grove re #8 Proposed Order to Judge, #7 Meet and Confer Statement, #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General , #6 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #4 Notice of Appearance (Wright-MacLeod, Corinne)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Department of Employment & Economic Development, Steve Grove.(Wright-MacLeod, Corinne)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #5 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Department of Employment & Economic Development, Steve Grove.(Wright-MacLeod, Corinne)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Department of Employment & Economic Development, Steve Grove. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Wright-MacLeod, Corinne)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Department of Employment & Economic Development, Steve Grove. (Wright-MacLeod, Corinne)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Corinne Wright-MacLeod on behalf of Department of Employment & Economic Development, Steve Grove. (Wright-MacLeod, Corinne)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gamada A. Hussein. Department of Employment & Economic Development served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. (MMP) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (MMP). Document QC'd by KMH on 10/8/2019 (KMH).
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Conventionally as to Department of Employment & Economic Development, John Does, Steve Grove. (MMG) Modified text on 9/9/2019 (MMG). Document QC'd on 9/19/2019 (NAH).
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of Employment & Economic Development, John Does, Steve Grove (filing fee $400, receipt number 34641015692) filed by Gamada A. Hussein. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A-C) cc:Hussein (MMG) Document QC'd on 9/19/2019 (NAH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hussein v. Department of Employment & Economic Development et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Grove
Represented By: Corinne Wright-MacLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Employment & Economic Development
Represented By: Corinne Wright-MacLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gamada A. Hussein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?