Hogquist v. Anoka County District Courts et al
Petitioner: Michelle Lyn Hogquist
Respondent: City of Anoka Police Department, Attorney General, State of Minnesota, The and Anoka County District Courts
Case Number: 0:2019cv02471
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. NEF and Documents #10 not re-sent to Michelle Lyn Hogquist as address is unknown. (KDS) Document QC'd by KMH on 11/1/2019 (KMH).
October 28, 2019 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #11 not sent to Michelle Lyn Hogquist. No forwarding address. (CLK) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/30/2019 (KMH).
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Michelle Lyn Hogquist, #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Michelle Lyn Hogquist filed by Michelle Lyn Hogquist. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 10/24/2019. (KAT)
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 SEALED EXHIBIT by Michelle Hogquist. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kt)RESTRICTED PER JUDGE MENENDEZ'S CHAMBERS. (kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/22/2019 (KMH).
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail not resent to Michelle Lyn Hogquist. Return to Sender, Not Here, Released on 9/30/2019, No Forwarding Address..(MMP)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Michelle Lyn Hogquist in response to Letters #4 , #5 . (lmb) cc: Michelle Lyn Hogquist with Resources for Finding an Attorney.
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of Minnesota, The (Kelley, Kelsey)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelsey R Kelley on behalf of State of Minnesota, The. (Kelley, Kelsey)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER to The Court from Michelle Lyn Hogquist. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Envelope, #4 Envelope)(lmb) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/10/2019 (KMH).
September 26, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus: rescanned Petition to include p. 10 and backside of last page. (KMH)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER to The Court from Michelle Lyn Hogquist. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmb) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/7/2019 (KMH).
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Anoka County District Courts, Attorney General, City of Anoka Police Department, State of Minnesota, The Attorney Substitution. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter Attorney Substitution)(Stockmeyer, Edwin)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Michelle Lyn Hogquist. (MKB) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/26/2019 (KMH).
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Michelle Lyn Hogquist. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd, 4th - Prisoner) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (MKB) cc: Hogquist. (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2019: #2 Rescanned Petition) (KMH). Document QC'd by KMH on 9/26/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hogquist v. Anoka County District Courts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: City of Anoka Police Department
Represented By: Edwin William Stockmeyer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Represented By: Edwin William Stockmeyer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Minnesota, The
Represented By: Kelsey R Kelley
Represented By: Edwin William Stockmeyer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Anoka County District Courts
Represented By: Edwin William Stockmeyer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michelle Lyn Hogquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?