Benson v. C.R. Bard Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jackson Benson
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. and C.R. Bard Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv02480
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Becky R Thorson
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 SECOND NOTICE: TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Ben C Martin as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (kt)cc: Ben C Martin. (kt) Modified text on 10/10/2019 (kt).
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES that 19-cv-2482 (JRT/TNL), 19-cv-2483 (JRT/BRT), 19-cv-2498 (DWF/HB), 19-cv-2499 (JNE/LIB), and 19-cv-2500 (JRT/KMM) have been reassigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim, Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright, Judge Donovan W. Frank, and Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 9/23/2019. (MKB)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Defendants C. R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., by counsel, hereby state that Defendant Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. is a wholly-owned subsidiary of C. R. Bard, Inc., and that Defendant C. R. Bard, Inc., is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Becton, Dickinson and Company (a publicly-held entity).(Stennes, Libretta) Modified text on 9/19/2019 (MMP).
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard Inc.. (Stennes, Libretta)
September 10, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Ben C Martin, Richard B North, Jr as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (kt) cc: Ben C Martin, Richard B North, Jr. (kt)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-01685. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson per 3rd/4th Master List.
September 9, 2019 Remark: Transferring Case to the District of Minnesota via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.]
May 31, 2016 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-1685-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.]
May 31, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13018346 filed by Jackson Benson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benson v. C.R. Bard Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?