Radisson Hotels International, Inc. v. Hospitality Management of Rutland, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Radisson Hotels International, Inc.
Defendant: Hospitality Management of Rutland, Inc., Anil Sachdev and Tulsi Rudraksha Hospitality, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv02510
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John R Tunheim
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER on #15 Stipulation. Hospitality Management of Rutland, Inc. answer or otherwise respond due date: 11/11/2019; Anil Sachdev answer or otherwise respond due date: 11/11/2019; Tulsi Rudraksha Hospitality, LLC answer or otherwise respond due date: 11/11/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 11/4/2019. (TMA)
November 1, 2019 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #15 Stipulation. (Holland, John)
November 1, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by Hospitality Management of Rutland, Inc., Anil Sachdev, Tulsi Rudraksha Hospitality, LLC. Jointly Signed by Radisson Hotels International, Inc.. (Holland, John)
October 8, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Radisson Hotels International, Inc.. Anil Sachdev served on 10/3/2019, answer due 11/1/2019. (Miller, Craig)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER on #10 Stipulation,. Hospitality Management of Rutland, Inc. answer or otherwise respond due date: 11/1/2019; Anil Sachdev answer or otherwise respond due date due 11/1/2019; Tulsi Rudraksha Hospitality, LLC answer or otherwise respond due date due 11/1/2019.Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 10/7/2019. (TMA)
October 4, 2019 Filing 12 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE - ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, Acknowledgement filed by Radisson Hotels International, Inc.. (Miller, Craig) Modified text on 10/8/2019 (MMP).
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 Stipulation,. (Holland, John)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by Hospitality Management of Rutland, Inc., Anil Sachdev, Tulsi Rudraksha Hospitality, LLC. Jointly Signed by Radisson Hotels International, Inc., Hospitality Management of Rutland, Inc., Anil Sachdev, and Tulsi Rudraksha Hospitality, LLC. (Holland, John)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John D Holland on behalf of Hospitality Management of Rutland, Inc., Anil Sachdev, Tulsi Rudraksha Hospitality, LLC. (Holland, John)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by J Michael Dady on behalf of Hospitality Management of Rutland, Inc., Anil Sachdev, Tulsi Rudraksha Hospitality, LLC. (Dady, J)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. This case is reassigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim for all further proceedings. Judge Joan N. Ericksen no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-2510 JRT/ECW. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim and Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 9/20/2019. (KDS)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Radisson Hotels International, Inc.. Tulsi Rudraksha Hospitality, LLC served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (Miller, Craig)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Radisson Hotels International, Inc.. Hospitality Management of Rutland, Inc. served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (Miller, Craig)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Hospitality Management of Rutland, Inc., Anil Sachdev, Tulsi Rudraksha Hospitality, LLC. (MMG)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-2510 JNE/ECW. (MMG)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.Radisson is a corporation organized under the laws of the state of Delaware with its principal place of business located at 701 Carlson Parkway, Minnetonka, Minnesota. Radisson is the franchisor of Radisson System Hotels, which operate under license agreements with Radisson. Radisson is a wholly-owned indirect subsidiary of Radisson Hospitality, Inc. (formerly known as Carlson Hotels, Inc. and formerly known as Carlson Hotels Worldwide, Inc.), a Minnesota corporation. Radisson Hospitality, Inc. is a wholly-owned indirect subsidiary of Aplite Holdings AB, organized under the laws of Sweden (Aplite), which is a majority-owned subsidiary of Jinjiang International Holdings Co., Ltd., (Jinjiang), organized under the laws of the Peoples Republic of China, which is wholly-owned by the Shanghai State-Owned Assets Supervision and Administration Commission of the State Council, an agency of the Peoples Republic of China (SSASAC). Aplite and Jinjiang have their principal place of business at 23 Floor, 100 Yanan East Road, Shanghai, 200002, China. SSASACs principal place of business is She Zheng Building, 100 Da Gu Road, Shanghai, 200003, China. Radisson and Radisson Hospitality, Inc. have their principal place of business at 701 Carlson Parkway, Suite 300, Minneapolis, Minnesota 55305.No Publicly Held Companies Neither Radisson, Radisson Hospitality, Inc., Aplite, Jinjiang, nor SSASAC is a publicly traded company. No publicly held company owns 10% or more of Radissons stock.(Miller, Craig) Modified text on 9/13/2019 (MMP).
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7142378) filed by Radisson Hotels International, Inc. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - License Agreement, #2 Exhibit(s) B. - Corporate Guaranty, #3 Exhibit(s) C - Personal Guaranty, #4 Exhibit(s) D - Termination Notice, #5 Exhibit(s)E - 10-16-18 Demand Letter, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Miller, Craig) Modified text on 9/13/2019 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Radisson Hotels International, Inc. v. Hospitality Management of Rutland, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospitality Management of Rutland, Inc.
Represented By: John D Holland
Represented By: J Michael Dady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anil Sachdev
Represented By: John D Holland
Represented By: J Michael Dady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulsi Rudraksha Hospitality, LLC
Represented By: John D Holland
Represented By: J Michael Dady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Radisson Hotels International, Inc.
Represented By: Craig P Miller
Represented By: Raymond J Konz
Represented By: Kirk W Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?