Estate of William Fisher v. Azar
Plaintiff: Estate of William Fisher
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Case Number: 0:2019cv02514
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER in Response to #9 Request. Defendant shall be granted an enlargement of time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, up to and including February 24, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 10/15/2019. (HAM)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Unopposed Request for Enlargement of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint #9 Request. (Hoskins, Adam)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST re #1 Complaint,,, FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Alex M. Azar, II. (Hoskins, Adam)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Estate of William Fisher. Alex M. Azar, II served on 9/27/2019, answer due 11/26/2019. (KNK) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/21/2019 (KMH).
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J Hoskins on behalf of Alex M. Azar, II. (Hoskins, Adam)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Alex M. Azar, II. and packets sent to the USM (KNK) Modified text on 10/16/2019 (KNK).
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES: Social Security Case Assignment Form Issued. Per #Local Rule 7.2, this form must be submitted to the clerk in paper on or before the answer due date. Please mail the completed form to:U.S. District Court for the District of MinnesotaClerks Office300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202Minneapolis, MN 55415 (KNK)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung per Social Security List. Please use case number 19-cv-2514 (TNL). (KNK)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #2 Sealed Document(s) - #2 Sealed Exhibit 2-C, [2-1] Sealed Exhibit 4, [2-2] Sealed Exhibit 6, [2-3] Sealed Exhibit 12, [2-4] Sealed Exhibit 13, [2-5] Sealed Exhibit 14, [2-6] Sealed Exhibit 15, [2-7] Sealed Exhibit 18, [2-8] Sealed Exhibit 19, [2-9] Sealed Exhibit 22, [2-10] Sealed Exhibit 23, [2-11] Sealed Exhibit 24 . (Carey, Shannon)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 SEALED EXHIBIT Sealed Exhibit 2 - C re #1 Complaint,,, by Estate of William Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 6, #3 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 12, #4 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 13, #5 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 14, #6 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 15, #7 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 18, #8 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 19, #9 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 22, #10 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 23, #11 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 24)(Carey, Shannon)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex M. Azar, II (filing fee $ 400, receipt number BMNDC-7143946) filed by Estate of William Fisher. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit 2 - A, B, #3 Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit 9, #8 Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit 10, #9 Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit 11, #10 Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit 16, #11 Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit 17, #12 Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit 20, #13 Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit 21, #14 Exhibit(s) Exhibit List, #15 Civil Cover Sheet) (Carey, Shannon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of William Fisher v. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of William Fisher
Represented By: Shannon C. Carey
Represented By: Marcia K Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Represented By: Adam J Hoskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?