Mackey et al v. EDC Install Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: The Minnesota Laborers Pension Fund, Joel Smith, John Nesse, Rick Peper, Joe Fowler, The Construction Laborers' Education, Training, and Apprenticeship Fund of Minnesota and North Dakota, The Minnesota Laborers Vacation Fund, The Minnesota Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, Mike Bubalo, Daniel Shoemaker, The Minnesota Laborers Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, Fred Chase, Tim Mackey, Heather Grazzini-Sims, Construction Laborers' Education, Training, and Apprenticeship Fund of Minnesota and North Dakota, the, Minnesota Laborers Vacation Fund, the, Minnesota Laborers Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, the, Minnesota Laborers Pension Fund, the and Minnesota Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, the
Defendant: EDC Install Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv02517
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Donovan W Frank
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Mike Bubalo, Fred Chase, Construction Laborers' Education, Training, and Apprenticeship Fund of Minnesota and North Dakota, the, Joe Fowler, Heather Grazzini-Sims, Tim Mackey(as Trustees of the Minnesota Laborers Pension Fund and any successors), Tim Mackey(as Trustees of the Minnesota Laborers Health and Welfare Fund and any successors), Minnesota Laborers Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, the, Minnesota Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, the, Minnesota Laborers Pension Fund, the, Minnesota Laborers Vacation Fund, the, John Nesse, Rick Peper, Daniel Shoemaker, Joel Smith re #9 MOTION for Entry of Judgment (Lawrie, Christy)
November 8, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mike Bubalo, Fred Chase, Construction Laborers' Education, Training, and Apprenticeship Fund of Minnesota and North Dakota, the, Joe Fowler, Heather Grazzini-Sims, Tim Mackey(as Trustees of the Minnesota Laborers Pension Fund and any successors), Tim Mackey(as Trustees of the Minnesota Laborers Health and Welfare Fund and any successors), Minnesota Laborers Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, the, Minnesota Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, the, Minnesota Laborers Pension Fund, the, Minnesota Laborers Vacation Fund, the, John Nesse, Rick Peper, Daniel Shoemaker, Joel Smith re #14 Proposed Order to Judge,, #11 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, #9 MOTION for Entry of Judgment , #10 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #13 Affidavit in Support of Motion,, #12 Affidavit in Support of Motion,, (Lawrie, Christy)
November 8, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 MOTION for Entry of Judgment filed by Mike Bubalo, Fred Chase, Construction Laborers' Education, Training, and Apprenticeship Fund of Minnesota and North Dakota, the, Joe Fowler, Heather Grazzini-Sims, Tim Mackey, Tim Mackey, Minnesota Laborers Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, the, Minnesota Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, the, Minnesota Laborers Pension Fund, the, Minnesota Laborers Vacation Fund, the, John Nesse, Rick Peper, Daniel Shoemaker, Joel Smith.(Lawrie, Christy)
November 8, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Rodney Skoog in SUPPORT OF #9 MOTION for Entry of Judgment filed by Mike Bubalo, Fred Chase, Construction Laborers' Education, Training, and Apprenticeship Fund of Minnesota and North Dakota, the, Joe Fowler, Heather Grazzini-Sims, Tim Mackey, Tim Mackey, Minnesota Laborers Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, the, Minnesota Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, the, Minnesota Laborers Pension Fund, the, Minnesota Laborers Vacation Fund, the, John Nesse, Rick Peper, Daniel Shoemaker, Joel Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-C)(Lawrie, Christy)
November 8, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Christy E. Lawrie in SUPPORT OF #9 MOTION for Entry of Judgment filed by Mike Bubalo, Fred Chase, Construction Laborers' Education, Training, and Apprenticeship Fund of Minnesota and North Dakota, the, Joe Fowler, Heather Grazzini-Sims, Tim Mackey, Tim Mackey, Minnesota Laborers Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, the, Minnesota Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, the, Minnesota Laborers Pension Fund, the, Minnesota Laborers Vacation Fund, the, John Nesse, Rick Peper, Daniel Shoemaker, Joel Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-B)(Lawrie, Christy)
November 8, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION for Entry of Judgment filed by Mike Bubalo, Fred Chase, Construction Laborers' Education, Training, and Apprenticeship Fund of Minnesota and North Dakota, the, Joe Fowler, Heather Grazzini-Sims, Tim Mackey, Tim Mackey, Minnesota Laborers Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, the, Minnesota Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, the, Minnesota Laborers Pension Fund, the, Minnesota Laborers Vacation Fund, the, John Nesse, Rick Peper, Daniel Shoemaker, Joel Smith. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lawrie, Christy)
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #9 MOTION for Entry of Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 1/3/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 7C (STP) before Judge Donovan W. Frank. (Lawrie, Christy)
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of Judgment filed by Mike Bubalo, Fred Chase, Construction Laborers' Education, Training, and Apprenticeship Fund of Minnesota and North Dakota, the, Joe Fowler, Heather Grazzini-Sims, Tim Mackey, Tim Mackey, Minnesota Laborers Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, the, Minnesota Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, the, Minnesota Laborers Pension Fund, the, Minnesota Laborers Vacation Fund, the, John Nesse, Rick Peper, Daniel Shoemaker, Joel Smith. (Lawrie, Christy)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to EDC Install Solutions, Inc. (MTP)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mike Bubalo, Fred Chase, Construction Laborers' Education, Training, and Apprenticeship Fund of Minnesota and North Dakota, the, Joe Fowler, Heather Grazzini-Sims, Tim Mackey(as Trustees of the Minnesota Laborers Pension Fund and any successors), Tim Mackey(as Trustees of the Minnesota Laborers Health and Welfare Fund and any successors), Minnesota Laborers Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, the, Minnesota Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, the, Minnesota Laborers Pension Fund, the, Minnesota Laborers Vacation Fund, the, John Nesse, Rick Peper, Daniel Shoemaker, Joel Smith re #6 Declaration,, #5 Application for Entry of Default (Court, Amy)
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Amy L. Court re #5 Application for Entry of Default by Mike Bubalo, Fred Chase, Construction Laborers' Education, Training, and Apprenticeship Fund of Minnesota and North Dakota, the, Joe Fowler, Heather Grazzini-Sims, Tim Mackey(as Trustees of the Minnesota Laborers Pension Fund and any successors), Tim Mackey(as Trustees of the Minnesota Laborers Health and Welfare Fund and any successors), Minnesota Laborers Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, the, Minnesota Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, the, Minnesota Laborers Pension Fund, the, Minnesota Laborers Vacation Fund, the, John Nesse, Rick Peper, Daniel Shoemaker, Joel Smith . (Court, Amy)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT . (Court, Amy)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minnesota Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, the, Fred Chase, John Nesse, Tim Mackey(as Trustees of the Minnesota Laborers Health and Welfare Fund and any successors), Minnesota Laborers Vacation Fund, the, Heather Grazzini-Sims, Tim Mackey(as Trustees of the Minnesota Laborers Pension Fund and any successors), Mike Bubalo, Minnesota Laborers Pension Fund, the, Construction Laborers' Education, Training, and Apprenticeship Fund of Minnesota and North Dakota, the, Minnesota Laborers Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, the, Joe Fowler, Daniel Shoemaker, Rick Peper, Joel Smith. EDC Install Solutions, Inc. served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Court, Amy)
September 16, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Donovan W. Frank's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these practice pointers, in addition to the District of Minnesota's Local Rules and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (las)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to EDC Install Solutions, Inc. (KDS)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per 3rd/4th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 19-cv-2517 DWF/BRT. (KDS)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EDC Install Solutions, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7144263) filed by The Minnesota Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, Fred Chase, John Nesse, Tim Mackey(as Trustees of the Minnesota Laborers Health and Welfare Fund and any successors), The Minnesota Laborers Vacation Fund, Heather Grazzini-Sims, Tim Mackey(as Trustees of the Minnesota Laborers Pension Fund and any successors), Mike Bubalo, The Minnesota Laborers Pension Fund, The Construction Laborers' Education, Training, and Apprenticeship Fund of Minnesota and North Dakota, The Minnesota Laborers Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, Joe Fowler, Daniel Shoemaker, Rick Peper, Joel Smith. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mackey et al v. EDC Install Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Minnesota Laborers Pension Fund
Represented By: Amy L Court
Represented By: Carl S Wosmek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Smith
Represented By: Amy L Court
Represented By: Carl S Wosmek
Represented By: Christy E Lawrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Nesse
Represented By: Amy L Court
Represented By: Carl S Wosmek
Represented By: Christy E Lawrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Peper
Represented By: Amy L Court
Represented By: Carl S Wosmek
Represented By: Christy E Lawrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Fowler
Represented By: Amy L Court
Represented By: Carl S Wosmek
Represented By: Christy E Lawrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Construction Laborers' Education, Training, and Apprenticeship Fund of Minnesota and North Dakota
Represented By: Amy L Court
Represented By: Carl S Wosmek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Minnesota Laborers Vacation Fund
Represented By: Amy L Court
Represented By: Carl S Wosmek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Minnesota Laborers Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Amy L Court
Represented By: Carl S Wosmek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Bubalo
Represented By: Amy L Court
Represented By: Carl S Wosmek
Represented By: Christy E Lawrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Shoemaker
Represented By: Amy L Court
Represented By: Carl S Wosmek
Represented By: Christy E Lawrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Minnesota Laborers Employers Cooperation and Education Trust
Represented By: Amy L Court
Represented By: Carl S Wosmek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Chase
Represented By: Amy L Court
Represented By: Carl S Wosmek
Represented By: Christy E Lawrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Mackey
Represented By: Amy L Court
Represented By: Carl S Wosmek
Represented By: Christy E Lawrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Grazzini-Sims
Represented By: Amy L Court
Represented By: Carl S Wosmek
Represented By: Christy E Lawrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Construction Laborers' Education, Training, and Apprenticeship Fund of Minnesota and North Dakota, the
Represented By: Carl S Wosmek
Represented By: Amy L Court
Represented By: Christy E Lawrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minnesota Laborers Vacation Fund, the
Represented By: Carl S Wosmek
Represented By: Amy L Court
Represented By: Christy E Lawrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minnesota Laborers Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, the
Represented By: Carl S Wosmek
Represented By: Amy L Court
Represented By: Christy E Lawrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minnesota Laborers Pension Fund, the
Represented By: Carl S Wosmek
Represented By: Amy L Court
Represented By: Christy E Lawrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minnesota Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, the
Represented By: Carl S Wosmek
Represented By: Amy L Court
Represented By: Christy E Lawrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDC Install Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?