Jones v. Capella University - Julie Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Latreka Jones
Defendant: Capella University - Shannon Stordahl/Joe Rennie, Capella University - Dr. Jennifer Raymar and Capella University - Julie Johnson
Case Number: 0:2019cv02521
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #1 Complaint: Rescanned envelope. (KMH)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Regarding Dispositive Motion Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 9/24/2019. (CLB) cc:Latreka Jones. Modified text on 9/24/2019 (MMG).
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Order Granting IFP and USM Forms to Complete cc: Jones. (MMP)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 9/17/2019. (KAT) cc: Latreka Jones. Modified text on 9/18/2019 (MMP).
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Latreka Jones. (JGK) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/24/2019 (KMH).
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capella University - Dr. Jennifer Raymar, Capella University - Julie Johnson, Capella University - Shannon Stordahl/Joe Rennie filed by Latreka Jones. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Kate M.Menendez. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (JGK) cc: Jones. (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2019: #4 Rescanned envelope) (KMH). Document QC'd by KMH on 9/24/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Capella University - Julie Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capella University - Shannon Stordahl/Joe Rennie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capella University - Dr. Jennifer Raymar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capella University - Julie Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latreka Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?