Halloran v. AFSCME Council 5 et al
Plaintiff: Susan Halloran
Defendant: AFSCME Council 5 and Eric Davis
Case Number: 0:2019cv02529
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #43 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Eric Davis answer or otherwise respond due date: 11/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 11/12/2019. (TMA)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #41 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer AFSCME Council 5 answer or otherwise respond due date: 11/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 11/12/2019. (TMA)
November 12, 2019 Filing 44 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #43 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Miltich, Cicely)
November 12, 2019 Filing 43 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Eric Davis. (Miltich, Cicely)
November 12, 2019 Filing 42 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #41 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Dayan, Leon)
November 12, 2019 Filing 41 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by AFSCME Council 5. (Dayan, Leon)
October 31, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Corwin, Gregg)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #37 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint AFSCME Council 5 answer or otherwise respond due date: 11/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 10/30/2019. (TMA)
October 29, 2019 Filing 38 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #37 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by AFSCME Council 5.(Dayan, Leon)
October 29, 2019 Filing 37 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by AFSCME Council 5. (Dayan, Leon)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER on #34 Stipulation. Eric Davis answer or otherwise respond due date: 11/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 10/23/2019. (TMA)
October 22, 2019 Filing 35 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #34 Stipulation. (Miltich, Cicely)
October 22, 2019 Filing 34 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Eric Davis. Jointly Signed by Susan Halloran. (Miltich, Cicely)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. Case reassigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright for all further proceedings. Judge Nancy E. Brasel, Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-2529 SRN/ECW. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 10/17/2019. (MMG)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brian Kelsey for Susan Halloran. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 10/11/2019. (NAH)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER on #29 Stipulation. AFSCME Council 5 answer due 10/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 10/8/2019. (JLB)
October 8, 2019 Filing 30 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #29 Stipulation. (Dayan, Leon)
October 8, 2019 Filing 29 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Responsive Pleading by AFSCME Council 5. Jointly Signed by Susan Halloran. (Dayan, Leon)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #26 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Leon Dayan for AFSCME Council 5; granting #27 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Georgina Yeomans for AFSCME Council 5. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 10/7/2019. (NAH)
October 4, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Georgina Yeomans. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7191090 filed by AFSCME Council 5. (Corwin, Gregg)
October 4, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Leon Dayan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7191074 filed by AFSCME Council 5. (Corwin, Gregg)
October 3, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Halloran. Eric Davis served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. (Dickey, James)
September 27, 2019 Filing 24 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Susan Halloran in Response to Notice of Related Cases (Dkt 19). (Dickey, James)
September 25, 2019 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Susan Halloran re #20 Notice (Other) upon Eric Davis (Dickey, James)
September 25, 2019 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Susan Halloran re #20 Notice (Other) upon AFSCME Council 5 (Dickey, James)
September 24, 2019 Filing 21 (Text-Only) AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The hearing scheduled with the Court on 12/2/19 has been stricken from the Court Calendar based on the Plaintiff's withdrawal of the motion. (KMW)
September 24, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Susan Halloran re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Withdrawing Motion (Dickey, James)
September 24, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by AFSCME Council 5 Notice of Related Cases (Corwin, Gregg)
September 24, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Susan Halloran re #15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brian K. Kelsey. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7162541 and Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel R. Suhr UPON Eric Davis (Dickey, James)
September 24, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Susan Halloran re #15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brian K. Kelsey. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7162541 and Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel R. Suhr UPON Leon Dayan (Dickey, James)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel Robert Suhr for Susan Halloran. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 9/23/2019. (JGK)
September 23, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brian K. Kelsey. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7162541 filed by Susan Halloran. (Dickey, James)
September 23, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel R. Suhr. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7162518 filed by Susan Halloran. (Dickey, James)
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Susan Halloran re #6 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #9 Proposed Order to Judge, #8 Declaration in Support, #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion upon Eric Davis (Dickey, James)
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Susan Halloran re #6 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #9 Proposed Order to Judge, #8 Declaration in Support, #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion upon AFSCME Council 5 (Dickey, James)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Halloran. Eric Davis served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019. (Dickey, James)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Halloran. AFSCME Council 5 served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Dickey, James)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Susan Halloran.(Dickey, James)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 Declaration of Susan Halloran in Support of #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Susan Halloran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-5)(Dickey, James)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Susan Halloran. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Dickey, James)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3A (STP) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (Dickey, James)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 WITHDRAWN Per Notice #20 filed 09/24/2019. MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Susan Halloran. (Dickey, James) Modified text/link on 9/25/2019 (lmb).
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Brian K. Kelsey and Daniel R. Suhr as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MMP)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AFSCME Council 5, Eric Davis. (MMP)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-2529 (NEB/LIB). (MMP)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7148129) filed by Susan Halloran. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dickey, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halloran v. AFSCME Council 5 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AFSCME Council 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Halloran
Represented By: James V. F. Dickey
Represented By: Douglas P Seaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?