Kelley v. Vlahos et al
Plaintiff: Douglas A Kelley
Defendant: Dean Vlahos and Home Federal Savings Bank
Case Number: 0:2019cv02554
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0157
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 24 LETTER from Bankruptcy Court Acknowledging Receipt of Order of Remand. (KNK) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/22/2019 (KMH).
October 10, 2019 Filing 23 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Bankruptcy Court re: Order of Remand. (MMG) cc:Bankruptcy. Modified text on 10/10/2019 (MMG).
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is REMANDED to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Minnesota. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 10/4/2019. (CLG) C/C:Bankruptcy. Modified text on 10/10/2019 (MMG).
October 3, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew B Brantingham on behalf of Douglas A Kelley. (Brantingham, Andrew)
September 26, 2019 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE OF RECEIPT AND ASSIGNMENT IN RE: BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL (kt)
September 26, 2019 Filing 19 (Text-Only) NOTICE: In Chambers Status Conference set for 10/4/2019 at 08:30 AM in Chambers 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (CLG)
September 19, 2019 Filing 18 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd, 4th - Bankruptcy list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-2554 (PJS/LIB). (KNK)
September 19, 2019 Filing 17 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(1), the Clerk of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Minnesota gives notice that the record for this appeal is available electronically.(LH)
September 19, 2019 Filing 16 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 3/20/2019. Court Reporter: Kathy Barksdale. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/19/2019.(LH)
September 19, 2019 Filing 15 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 3/4/2019. Court Reporter: Kathy Barksdale. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/3/2019.(LH)
September 19, 2019 Filing 14 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 6/27/2018. Court Reporter: Kathy Barksdale. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/27/2018.(LH)
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Scheduling Conference held on 4/25/2018. Court Reporter: Kathy Barksdale. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/25/2018.(LH)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 6/28/2017. Court Reporter: Kathy Barksdale. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/2/2017.(LH)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 5/24/2017. Court Reporter: Kathy Barksdale. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/28/2017.(LH)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 4/26/2017. Court Reporter: Kathy Barksdale. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/31/2017.(LH)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 9/28/2016. Court Reporter: Kathy Barksdale. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2017.(LH)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 9/6/2016. Court Reporter: Kathy Barksdale. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2016.(LH)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL for Adversary Proceeding Number 10-04416. (Attachments: #1 Docket for BKY 08-45257, #2 Identification of residence form)(LH)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL for Adversary Proceeding Number 10-04416. (Attachments: #1 Notice of filing of official transcript, #2 BNC certificate, #3 BNC certificate, #4 Docket for ADV 10-04416)(LH)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL for Adversary Proceeding Number 10-04416. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Reply filed by plaintiff, #3 Notice of filing of official transcript, #4 BNC certificate, #5 Order granting in part and denying in part motion to allow supplemental expert report)(LH)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL for Adversary Proceeding Number 10-04416. (Attachments: #1 Notice of transcript, #2 BNC certificate, #3 BNC certificate, #4 Withdrawal of motion to compel, #5 Withdrawal of motion to compel, #6 Notice of transcript, #7 BNC certificate, #8 Order granting motion to coordinate, #9 Stipulation regarding scheduling, #10 BNC certificate, #11 Order amending schedule, #12 BNC certificate, #13 Stipulation, #14 Order amending scheduling, #15 BNC certificate, #16 Order for pretrial conference, #17 BNC certificate, #18 Notice of filing of official transcript, #19 BNC certificate, #20 Motion to amend complaint, #21 Response to motion to amend, #22 Reply filed by plaintiff, #23 Order granting motion to amend complaint, #24 Amended complaint second, #25 Notice of filing of official transcript, #26 BNC certificate, #27 BNC certificate, #28 Answer to complaint with demand for jury, #29 Order for omnibus status conference, #30 BNC certificate, #31 Stipulation to reschedule status conference, #32 Order rescheduling status conference, #33 BNC certificate, #34 Motion to allow supplemental expert report, #35 Opposition brief)(LH)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL for Adversary Proceeding Number 10-04416. (Attachments: #1 BNC certificate, #2 Order establishing scheduling, #3 Order referring to mediation, #4 BNC certificate, #5 BNC certificate, #6 Order re filings, #7 BNC certificate, #8 Amended complaint, #9 Exhbiit Redline, #10 Answer, #11 Substitution of attorney, #12 Order re filings, #13 Motion to compel, #14 Notice of continued hearing, #15 Motion to compel, #16 Motion to amend scheduling order, #17 Motion to coordinate depositions, #18 Opposition brief re scheduling, #19 Opposition brief re coordination, #20 Joint 7037 statement, #21 Support brief, #22 Support brief, #23 Notice of continued hearing, #24 Order granting motion to amend, #25 Order granting motion to com[pel, #26 BNC certificate, #27 BNC certificate, #28 Notice of transcript, #29 BNC certificate, #30 Notice of continued hearing, #31 Amended order re motion to compel, #32 Notice of continued hearing)(LH)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL for Adversary Proceeding Number 10-04416. (Attachments: #1 Order granting re discovery, #2 Order granting protective order, #3 Order modifying term 6, #4 Request for no notices, #5 Order approving stipulation, #6 Order further modifying, #7 Order modifying paragraph 6, #8 Order re motions for partial summary judgment, #9 Substitution of attorney, #10 Order for status conference, #11 BNC certificate, #12 Status report plaintiff, #13 Substitution of attorney, #14 Status report of defendants, #15 Notice of appearance, #16 Notice of appearance, #17 Motion to refer to mediation, #18 Motion establishing scheduling, #19 Notice of transcript, #20 BNC certificate, #21 Notice of withdrawal, #22 Notice of transcript, #23 Substitution of attorney)(LH)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 TRANSFER OF ADVERSARY PROCEEDING from United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Minnesota. Bankruptcy Court case number 08-45257. Adversary Proceeding number 19-04416. filed by Douglas A Kelley. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Certificate of service, #4 Pro bono notice, #5 BNC certificate, #6 Order re proceedings, #7 BNC certificate, #8 Answer, #9 Corporate ownership statement, #10 Notice of appearance, #11 Substitution of attorney, #12 Notice of withdrawal, #13 Certificate of service, #14 Notice of withdrawal, #15 Certificate of service, #16 Substitution of attorney, #17 Notice of appearance, #18 Notice of appearance, #19 Notice of appearance, #20 Withdrawal, #21 Notice of pertinent dates, #22 Motion re discovery) (LH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelley v. Vlahos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas A Kelley
Represented By: Lucas J Olson
Represented By: J David Jackson
Represented By: Kevin M Magnuson
Represented By: Andrew B Brantingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Vlahos
Represented By: Andrew D Moran
Represented By: Kevin D Hofman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Federal Savings Bank
Represented By: Kevin D Hofman
Represented By: Zachary J Crain
Represented By: John Harper, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?