Cockrell v. Saul
Plaintiff: Gavan Scot Cockrell
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 0:2019cv02565
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. A notice to withdraw consent has been filed in this case and is now assigned to Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson and Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-2565 PAM/HB. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (MMG)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda H Green on behalf of Andrew Saul. (Green, Linda)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gavan Scot Cockrell. Andrew Saul served on 10/8/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (CLK) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/21/2019 (KMH).
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. (KDS)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/24/2019. (JMK)
September 23, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES: Social Security Case Assignment Form Issued. Per #Local Rule 7.2, this form must be submitted to the clerk in paper on or before the answer due date. Please mail the completed form to:U.S. District Court for the District of MinnesotaClerks Office300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202Minneapolis, MN 55415 (CLK)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer per Social Security List. Please use case number 19-cv-2565 HB. (CLK)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Gavan Scot Cockrell. (Greeman, James)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filed by Gavan Scot Cockrell. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Attachment, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Greeman, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cockrell v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gavan Scot Cockrell
Represented By: James H Greeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?