Thapa v. St. Cloud Orthopedic Associates, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Anuj Thapa
Defendant: St. Cloud Orthopedic Associates, Ltd. and CentraCare Health System
Case Number: 0:2019cv02568
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah M Hoffman on behalf of CentraCare Health System. (Hoffman, Sarah)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Anuj Thapa. CentraCare Health System waiver sent on 10/3/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Thompson, Brandon)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Anuj Thapa. St. Cloud Orthopedic Associates, Ltd. waiver sent on 10/3/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Thompson, Brandon)
October 2, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION -DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - INCORRECT CASE for #5 Memorandum (MMP)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WRONG CASE - PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DR. MAYER'S filed by Seui Cavan.(MMP) Modified text on 10/2/2019 (MMP).
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CentraCare Health System, St. Cloud Orthopedic Associates, Ltd.. (MMP)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET ENTRY FILED IN ERROR - WILL REISSUE - Summons Issued as to CentraCare Health System, St. Cloud Orthopedic Associates, Ltd. (MMP) Modified text on 9/20/2019 (MMP).
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-2568 (JRT/TNL). (MMP)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7159556) filed by Anuj Thapa. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Expert Identification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Thompson, Brandon) Modified text on 9/20/2019 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thapa v. St. Cloud Orthopedic Associates, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anuj Thapa
Represented By: Brandon Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Cloud Orthopedic Associates, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CentraCare Health System
Represented By: Sarah M Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?