Weisen v. B&B of Maple Grove, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Weisen
Defendant: CH Retail Fund II/Minneapolis Knollwood Crossings, L.L.C. and B&B of Maple Grove, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv02573
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Michael J Davis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12188
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Defendant CH Retail Fund II/Minneapolis Knollwood Crossings, L.L.C.'s Third Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer. Answer due 12/12/2019. The Court will conduct a telephone conference with counsel before granting any additional extensions of time to answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 11/6/2019. (JMK)
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by CH Retail Fund II/Minneapolis Knollwood Crossings, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(O'Brien, Mary)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting second #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer an Answer to Plaintiff's Original Complaint. CH Retail Fund II/Minneapolis Knollwood Crossings, L.L.C. answer due 11/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/8/2019. (JMK)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CH Retail Fund II/Minneapolis Knollwood Crossings, L.L.C. re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (O'Brien, Mary)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by CH Retail Fund II/Minneapolis Knollwood Crossings, L.L.C.. (O'Brien, Mary)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by CH Retail Fund II/Minneapolis Knollwood Crossings, L.L.C. re #4 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (O'Brien, Mary)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File an Answer to Plaintiff's Original Complaint. CH Retail Fund II/Minneapolis Knollwood Crossings, L.L.C. answer due 10/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/25/2019. (JMK)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by CH Retail Fund II/Minneapolis Knollwood Crossings, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(O'Brien, Mary)
September 23, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations, ADA Other) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-2573 MJD/HB. (CLK)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-7160720) filed by CH Retail Fund II/Minneapolis Knollwood Crossings, L.L.C. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) B Notice of Service of Process, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (O'Brien, Mary) Modified text on 9/25/2019 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weisen v. B&B of Maple Grove, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CH Retail Fund II/Minneapolis Knollwood Crossings, L.L.C.
Represented By: Mary M L O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B&B of Maple Grove, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Weisen
Represented By: Chad Throndset
Represented By: Patrick W Michenfelder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?