Wietzema v. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Daryl Wietzema
Defendant: Janssen Pharamceuticals, Inc. and Does 1-50
Case Number: 0:2019cv02659
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 14 (Text-Only) COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This docket contains pleadings and orders pertaining to this case only and some, but not all, orders from the master case file In re: Fluoroquinolone Products Liability Litigation, 0:15-md-2642 (JRT). Counsel shall read and comply with all Pretrial Orders filed in this master case. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 0:15-md-2642-JRT. Additionally, access to Pretrial Orders, minutes, transcripts, and other documents issued in the master case may be found on the Fluoroquinolone MDL website at: #http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/MDL-Fluoroquinolone/index.shtml. (kt)
October 7, 2019 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of North Dakota; Case Number 3:19-cv-00067. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per MDL List.
October 7, 2019 Filing 12 TRANSFER ORDER (certified copy) transferring case to Minneosta to be included in MDL Docket No. 2642. Case transferred via ECF extract civil case feature.(js) [Transferred from North Dakota on 10/7/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE (Order Reinstating Stay of Conditional Transfer Order) filed by MDL - District of Minnesota - Case #2642. (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 10/7/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Cancelling Hearing by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 6/5/2019 is CANCELLED. (AS) [Transferred from North Dakota on 10/7/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and referred to Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal for all further proceedings. (lh) [Transferred from North Dakota on 10/7/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (lh) [Transferred from North Dakota on 10/7/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 6/5/2019 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal in Fargo Courtroom 2. (CS) Modified on 4/29/2019 to add location of conference (cjs). [Transferred from North Dakota on 10/7/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re #5 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) (Edison, Brent) [Transferred from North Dakota on 10/7/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Edison, Brent) [Transferred from North Dakota on 10/7/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Daryl Wietzema. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/2/2019. (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 10/7/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/2/2019. (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 10/7/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 10/7/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. from Cass County District Court, case number 09-2018-cv-3222. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 319000270 filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint filed in Cass County District Court, #2 Exhibit 2 - Cass County District Court Register of Actions, #3 Affidavit of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 10/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wietzema v. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharamceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Brent J. Edison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daryl Wietzema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?