West Bend Mutual Insurance Company v. Azar
Plaintiff: West Bend Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Case Number: 0:2019cv02702
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Alex M. Azar, II. (Hoskins, Adam)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER TO OPPOSING PARTY RE: RULE 4 by Alex M. Azar, II. (Voss, Ana) Modified text on 11/7/2019 (CLK).
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. Alex M. Azar, II served on 10/16/2019, answer due 11/6/2019. (Stahley, Daniel)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Alex M. Azar, II. (KDS)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-2702 NEB/DTS. (KDS)
October 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex M. Azar, II (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7206264) filed by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Stahley, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West Bend Mutual Insurance Company v. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Adam J Hoskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Bend Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel J. Stahley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?