Fleming v United States Department of Justice et al
Plaintiff: Rhonda Fleming
Defendant: Angela Dunbar, Health Services Administrator, Captain Shannon Bauserman, Lieutenant Kuhn, Tompkins, Six Unknown BOP Correctional Officers - Waseca, Jeremy Sparks, Carswell, Nurse Sines, Eight Unknown BOP Correctional Officers - Hazelton, Friend, Warden Fredrick Entzel, Lieutenant Riehm, United States Department of Justice, Three Unknown BOP Correctional Officers - Carsell and Director of the Bureau of Prisons
Case Number: 0:2019cv02713
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 44 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (kt) cc: Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball. (kt)
October 15, 2019 Filing 43 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:18-cv-03029. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson and referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez per 3rd/4th Prisoner List.
October 8, 2019 Filing 42 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Plaintiff's supplemental brief. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file denied. Case already transferred" Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/08/2019. (jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
October 3, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Transfer due by 10/10/2019. (zjd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Discovery by RHONDA FLEMING (jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying #27 Plaintiff's Motion to Modify; denying #27 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying #30 Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from Judgment; granting #31 Defendants' Motion to Strike; denying #31 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration; granting #31 Defendants' Motion to Transfer Case; denying #36 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time; denying #36 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying #39 Plaintiff's Motion for Hearing; denying #17 Plaintiff's Motion for TRO; denying #17 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying #21 Plaintiff's Motion for TRO; denying #21 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Transfer due by 10/10/2019. See attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/20/2019. (lcapm1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION for Emergency Hearing Injunctive Hearing by RHONDA FLEMING. "LET THIS BE FILED" Signed by Amit P. Mehta, USDJ on 09/17/2019 (jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 38 SUPPLEMENT re #37 Surreply, filed by RHONDA FLEMING. "LET THIS BE FILED" Signed by Amit P. Mehta, USDJ on 09/17/2019 (jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 37 SURREPLY re #31 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint 's Class Allegations MOTION for Reconsideration re #9 Order Directing Prisoner Payment, and Granting Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, and MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404 filed by RHONDA FLEMING. "LET THIS BE FILED" Signed by Amit P. Mehta, USDJ on 09/17/2019 (jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Extension of Time, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by RHONDA FLEMING (zjf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 35 Letter from Plaintiff. "LET THIS BE FILED" Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/30/2019 (jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 34 Letter from Plaintiff. "LET THIS BE FILED" Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/30/2019 (jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 33 SUPPLEMENT re #30 MOTION for Relief filed by RHONDA FLEMING. (jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response due by 9/13/2019. (zjd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff shall respond by September 13, 2019, to Defendants' consolidated Motion to Strike, Motion for Reconsideration, Motion to Transfer, and Opposition. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/26/2019. (lcapm1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 32 Memorandum in opposition to re #21 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #27 MOTION to Modify MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by SHANNON BAUSERMAN, CAPTAIN OF FMC CARSWELL, DIRECTOR OF THE BUREAU OF PRISONS, ANGELA DUNBAR, EIGHT UNKNOWN BOP CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS, FREDRICK ENTZEL, FRIEND, KUHN, RIEHM-WASECA, SINES, SIX UNKNOWN BOP CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS, JEREMY SPARKS, THREE UNKNOWN BOP CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS, TOMPKINS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint 's Class Allegations, MOTION for Reconsideration re #9 Order Directing Prisoner Payment, and Granting Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, and, MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404 by SHANNON BAUSERMAN, CAPTAIN OF FMC CARSWELL, DIRECTOR OF THE BUREAU OF PRISONS, ANGELA DUNBAR, EIGHT UNKNOWN BOP CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS, FREDRICK ENTZEL, FRIEND, KUHN, RIEHM-WASECA, SINES, SIX UNKNOWN BOP CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS, JEREMY SPARKS, THREE UNKNOWN BOP CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS, TOMPKINS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Relief by RHONDA FLEMING (jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion by SHANNON BAUSERMAN, CAPTAIN OF FMC CARSWELL, DIRECTOR OF THE BUREAU OF PRISONS, ANGELA DUNBAR, EIGHT UNKNOWN BOP CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS, FREDRICK ENTZEL, FRIEND, KUHN, RIEHM-WASECA, SINES, SIX UNKNOWN BOP CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS, JEREMY SPARKS, THREE UNKNOWN BOP CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS, TOMPKINS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 28 DECLARATION by RHONDA FLEMING. (jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Sentence Reduction or to Modify, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by RHONDA FLEMING (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 26 Letter from Rhonda Fleming. "LET THIS BE FILED" Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/07/2019 (jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 25 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SHANNON BAUSERMAN served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019; FREDRICK ENTZEL served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019; FRIEND served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019; KUHN served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019; SINES served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019; JEREMY SPARKS served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019; TOMPKINS served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 (jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #24 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Defendants' time to respond to the Complaint is hereby extended up to and including 30 days after the court rules on Defendants' forthcoming motion concerning threshold procedural issues. Defendants shall address Plaintiff's second motion for injunctive relief in such motion. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/06/2019. (lcapm1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond by SHANNON BAUSERMAN, CAPTAIN OF FMC CARSWELL, DIRECTOR OF THE BUREAU OF PRISONS, ANGELA DUNBAR, EIGHT UNKNOWN BOP CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS, FREDRICK ENTZEL, FRIEND, KUHN, RIEHM-WASECA, SINES, SIX UNKNOWN BOP CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS, JEREMY SPARKS, THREE UNKNOWN BOP CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS, TOMPKINS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SHANNON BAUSERMAN, CAPTAIN OF FMC CARSWELL, DIRECTOR OF THE BUREAU OF PRISONS, ANGELA DUNBAR, EIGHT UNKNOWN BOP CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS, FREDRICK ENTZEL, FRIEND, KUHN, RIEHM-WASECA, SINES, SIX UNKNOWN BOP CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS, JEREMY SPARKS, THREE UNKNOWN BOP CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS, TOMPKINS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re #22 Notice of Appearance . (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball on behalf of All Defendants (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 21 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by RHONDA FLEMING (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 20 SUPPLEMENT re #18 Response to Order of the Court filed by RHONDA FLEMING. (jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 19 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to CAPTAIN OF FMC CARSWELL, ANGELA DUNBAR. (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
July 8, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #15 Order on Motion for TRO Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by RHONDA FLEMING. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit - Attachments) (tth) Modified event title on 7/16/2019 (znmw). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by RHONDA FLEMING. "LET THIS BE FILED" Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/24/19. (jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to Show Cause due by 8/5/2019. (zjd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #13 Plaintiff's Motion for Waiver. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/24/2019. (lcapm1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #3 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and denying Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause why this case should remain in this District and not be transferred to a more appropriate district given the nature of Plaintiff's claims. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/24/2019. (lcapm1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/6/2019. RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/6/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/5/2019.) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DIRECTOR OF THE BUREAU OF PRISONS served on 6/6/2019; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 6/6/2019. (tth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Waiver of Partial Filing Fee and Order Service of the Complaint by RHONDA FLEMING (jf). Added MOTION for Order on 6/14/2019 (znmw). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to SHANNON BAUSERMAN, CAPTAIN OF FMC CARSWELL, FREDRICK ENTZEL, FRIEND, KUHN, RIEHM-WASECA, SINES, JEREMY SPARKS, TOMPKINS. (jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS (9) REISSUED as to SHANNON BAUSERMAN, CAPTAIN OF FMC CARSWELL, FREDRICK ENTZEL, FRIEND, KUHN, RIEHM-WASECA, SINES, JEREMY SPARKS, TOMPKINS (zmc) (zmc). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS (14) Issued as to SHANNON BAUSERMAN, CAPTAIN OF FMC CARSWELL, DIRECTOR OF THE BUREAU OF PRISONS, ANGELA DUNBAR, FREDRICK ENTZEL, FRIEND, KUHN, RIEHM-WASECA, SINES, JEREMY SPARKS, TOMPKINS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (zmc) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $132.33 from Prison Account of RHONDA FLEMING and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail.. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 05/16/2019. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by RHONDA FLEMING (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File re #4 Order by RHONDA FLEMING (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by RHONDA FLEMING. (zmd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Sent to RHONDA FLEMING; Type of Document Returned: #4 Order. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 01/08/2019. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by RHONDA FLEMING (Attachment: #1 Supplement)(zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RHONDA FLEMING (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by RHONDA FLEMING.(zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 12/18/2018. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fleming v United States Department of Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Dunbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Services Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Shannon Bauserman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Kuhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Six Unknown BOP Correctional Officers - Waseca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Sines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eight Unknown BOP Correctional Officers - Hazelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Friend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Fredrick Entzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Riehm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Three Unknown BOP Correctional Officers - Carsell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of the Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?