Andrews v. United States of America et al
Petitioner: Norris Deshan Andrews and Norris Deshon Andrews
Respondent: Joel Brott, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Marshals Service, United States of America and Brian Frank
Case Number: 0:2019cv02732
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
2 Judge: David T Schultz
3 Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal, #2 Appeal Packet)(CLK)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 12/3/2019. (SMD)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Petition by Norris Deshon Andrews (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KDS)
November 21, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #2 Memorandum: the NEF for Document No. 2 was regenerated as it was missing pp. 5-9. The document was rescanned and attached. (KMH)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Norris Deshon Andrews. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 11/12/2019. (TJB)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Reassignment of Related Case. This case is reassigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson and Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz for all further proceedings. Chief Judge John R. Tunheim, Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-2732 (SRN/DTS). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson and Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 10/22/2019. (MMP)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Norris Deshan Andrews.(MTP) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/21/2019: #1 Rescanned Memorandum-complete document) (KMH). Document QC'd by KMH on 11/21/2019 (KMH).
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing fee $5, receipt number 44641104970) filed by Norris Deshan Andrews. No summons requested. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Master List, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (MTP) Modified text on 10/23/2019 (MMP). Document QC'd by KMH on 11/21/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrews v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joel Brott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Donald J. Trump
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Marshals Service
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Norris Deshan Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Norris Deshon Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?