Awnuh v. Public Housing Agency of the City of Saint Paul
Plaintiff: Abdi Awnuh
Defendant: Public Housing Agency of the City of Saint Paul
Case Number: 0:2019cv02765
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 1/30/2020 at 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 12/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(HAM)
December 5, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Public Housing Agency of the City of Saint Paul. (Kisch, Kara)
December 3, 2019 Filing 22 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(KDS)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying #7 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See Order for specifics. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 12/3/2019. (RMM)
November 25, 2019 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eric C. Tostrud: Motion Hearing held on 11/25/2019 re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Abdi Awnuh. (Court Reporter Tim Willette) (RMM)
November 22, 2019 Filing 19 Reply to Response to Motion re #7 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Abdi Awnuh. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s))(Holmes, Kristin)
November 21, 2019 Filing 18 EXHIBIT A-Q [REDACTED] TO DOMINIC MITCHELL AFFIDAVIT re #16 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, filed by Public Housing Agency of the City of Saint Paul.(Kisch, Kara)
November 19, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Jean Hausladen in OPPOSITION TO #7 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Public Housing Agency of the City of Saint Paul.(Kisch, Kara)
November 19, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Dominic Mitchell in OPPOSITION TO #7 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Public Housing Agency of the City of Saint Paul. (Attachments: #1Restricted Exhibit(s) A-Q)(Kisch, Kara) Modified restrictions/text on 11/21/2019 (CLK).
November 19, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Public Housing Agency of the City of Saint Paul. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Word Count Certificate of Compliance)(Kisch, Kara)
November 18, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Abdi Awnuh re #7 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested, #9 Proposed Order to Judge, #8 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #10 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #6 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, #11 Briefing Order, (Holmes, Kristin)
November 18, 2019 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed for Summons and Complaint served on Public Housing Agency of the City of Saint Paul on 11/15/2019, filed by Abdi Awnuh. (Holmes, Kristin)
November 15, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abdi Awnuh. Public Housing Agency of the City of Saint Paul served on 11/15/2019, answer due 12/6/2019. (kt) Document QC'd on 12/12/2019 (LPH).
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 BRIEFING ORDER re: #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 11/19/2019. Replies due by 11/22/2019. Motion Hearing set for 11/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Judge Eric C. Tostrud. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 11/7/2019. (RMM)
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #7 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested : Motion Hearing set for 11/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Judge Eric C. Tostrud. (Holmes, Kristin)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Abdi Awnuh.(Holmes, Kristin)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Abdi Awnuh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Holmes, Kristin)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Abdi Awnuh. (Holmes, Kristin)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Public Housing Agency of the City of Saint Paul. (CLK)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Order Granting IFP and USM Forms to Complete cc: Attorney Kristen J. Holmes with letter, Order, and USM form. (KDS)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 10/30/2019. (HAM)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations, ADA Other) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-2765 (ECT/TNL). (lmb)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Abdi Awnuh. (Holmes, Kristin)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Public Housing Agency of the City of Saint Paul filed by Abdi Awnuh. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - 15, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Holmes, Kristin) Modified text on 10/23/2019 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Awnuh v. Public Housing Agency of the City of Saint Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Housing Agency of the City of Saint Paul
Represented By: Kara M Kisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdi Awnuh
Represented By: Kristin J. Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?