Park Hospitality LLC v. AQ Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: Park Hospitality LLC
Defendant: Domingo Ansereo, AQ Group LLC, Martina Ansereo and Jaime Ansereo
Case Number: 0:2019cv02768
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
2 Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #13 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Miller, Craig)
December 20, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Park Hospitality LLC. Jointly Signed by AQ Group LLC, Domingo Ansereo, Jaime Ansereo, and Martina Ansereo. (Miller, Craig)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER on #10 Stipulation. Defendants shall have until December 11, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 12/3/2019. (HAM)
December 3, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 Stipulation. (Miller, Craig)
December 3, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, by Park Hospitality LLC. Jointly Signed by AQ Group LLC, Domingo Ansereo, Jaime Ansereo, and Martina Ansereo. (Miller, Craig)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Park Hospitality LLC. Martina Ansereo served on 11/6/2019, answer due 11/27/2019. (Miller, Craig)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Park Hospitality LLC. Jaime Ansereo served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. (Miller, Craig)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Park Hospitality LLC. Domingo Ansereo served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. (Miller, Craig)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Park Hospitality LLC. AQ Group LLC served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. (Miller, Craig)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-2768 (SRN/TNL). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/24/2019. (MMP)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to AQ Group LLC, Domingo Ansereo, Jaime Ansereo, Martina Ansereo. (MMP)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-2768 (SRN/HB). (MMP)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Park Hospitality LLC is majority-owned by Park Global Holdings, Inc. No publicly held company owns 10% or more of Parks stock. (Miller, Craig) Modified text on 10/24/2019 (lmb).
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7226308) filed by Park Hospitality LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - License Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Personal Guaranty, #3 Exhibit C - Termination Notice, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Miller, Craig) Modified text on 10/23/2019 (MMP).
October 23, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Park Hospitality LLC v. AQ Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domingo Ansereo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AQ Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martina Ansereo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime Ansereo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Park Hospitality LLC
Represented By: Raymond J Konz
Represented By: Kirk W Reilly
Represented By: Craig P Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?