Bellanger v. Bosch et al
Petitioner: Joseph Lee Bellanger
Respondent: Warden Guy Bosch and Keith Ellison
Case Number: 0:2019cv02770
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Braden Sczepanski on behalf of Guy Bosch. (Sczepanski, Braden)
November 7, 2019 Filing 11 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE. NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Keith Ellison. (Sczepanski, Braden) Modified text on 11/7/2019 (MKB).
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to the Respondent of the Minnesota Attorney General's Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General Petition For Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Joseph Lee Bellanger. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MKB) Document QC'd on 11/25/2019 (JGK).
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Keith Ellison Attorney Substitution. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter Attorney Substitution)(Stockmeyer, Edwin)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Keith Ellison re #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General Petition For Writ of Habeas Corpus, #6 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #5 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #3 Notice of Appearance, #7 Proposed Order to Judge 10/29/2019 (Stockmeyer, Edwin)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General Petition For Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Keith Ellison.(Stockmeyer, Edwin)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Keith Ellison re #5 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Keith Ellison.(Stockmeyer, Edwin)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General Petition For Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Keith Ellison.(Stockmeyer, Edwin)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss/General Petition For Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Keith Ellison. (Stockmeyer, Edwin)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Edwin William Stockmeyer, III on behalf of Keith Ellison. (Stockmeyer, Edwin)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Joseph Lee Bellanger. (JGK) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/29/2019 (KMH).
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Joseph Lee Bellanger. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JGK) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/29/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bellanger v. Bosch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Guy Bosch
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Represented By: Braden Sczepanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Keith Ellison
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Represented By: Braden Sczepanski
Represented By: Edwin William Stockmeyer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Lee Bellanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?