Presidio, Inc. et al v. Marquardt et al
Plaintiff: Presidio Networked Solutions LLC, Presidio Holdings Inc. and Presidio, Inc.
Defendant: Alchemy Technology Group, LLC and Lucas Marquardt
Case Number: 0:2019cv02778
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Donovan W Frank
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER FOR STIPULATED INJUNCTION re: #39 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 11/20/2019. ( Attachments: #1 SEALED Exhibit(s) A)(las) Modified access to main document and text on 11/20/2019. Access to Exhibit A is restricted to applicable parties only. (las).
November 19, 2019 Filing 42 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #41 Sealed Document(s) - #41 Sealed Exhibit A to Proposed Order for Stipulated Injunction. (Rashid, Faris)
November 19, 2019 Filing 41 SEALED EXHIBIT A to Proposed Order for Stipulated Injunction re #40 Proposed Order to Judge by Presidio Holdings Inc., Presidio Networked Solutions LLC, Presidio, Inc. (Rashid, Faris) Modified text on 11/20/2019 (lmb).
November 19, 2019 Filing 40 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #39 Stipulation. (Rashid, Faris)
November 19, 2019 Filing 39 STIPULATION FOR INJUNCTION by Presidio Holdings Inc., Presidio Networked Solutions LLC, Presidio, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Lucas Marquardt and Alchemy Technology Group, LLC. (Rashid, Faris)
November 19, 2019 Filing 38 (Text-Only) NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: Upon the request of the parties: The Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2019 at 01:30 PM and for 1/3/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Donovan W. Frank HAVE BEEN CANCELLED. (las)
November 15, 2019 Filing 37 Declaration of Jamie Anderson in Support of #3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Presidio Holdings Inc., Presidio Networked Solutions LLC, Presidio, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Rashid, Faris)
November 15, 2019 Filing 36 AFFIDAVIT of Richard A. Abraham in SUPPORT OF #3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Presidio Holdings Inc., Presidio Networked Solutions LLC, Presidio, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-F)(Rashid, Faris)
November 15, 2019 Filing 35 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Presidio Holdings Inc., Presidio Networked Solutions LLC, Presidio, Inc. . (Rashid, Faris)
November 12, 2019 Filing 34 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and/or Transfer Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Alchemy Technology Group, LLC.(O'Malley, Joel)
November 12, 2019 Filing 33 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #30 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Alchemy Technology Group, LLC.(O'Malley, Joel)
November 12, 2019 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM in Support re #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and/or Transfer Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Alchemy Technology Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(O'Malley, Joel)
November 12, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and/or Transfer Plaintiffs' Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 1/3/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Donovan W. Frank. (O'Malley, Joel)
November 12, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and/or Transfer Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Alchemy Technology Group, LLC. (O'Malley, Joel). Added MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue on 11/13/2019 (kt).
November 12, 2019 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Alchemy Technology Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(O'Malley, Joel)
November 12, 2019 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Mark Grassmann in Opposition to #3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Lucas Marquardt.(O'Malley, Joel)
November 12, 2019 Filing 27 DECLARATION of James Galicia in Opposition to #3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Lucas Marquardt.(O'Malley, Joel)
November 12, 2019 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Tom Moreno in Opposition to #3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Lucas Marquardt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(O'Malley, Joel)
November 12, 2019 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Lucas Marquardt in Opposition to #3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Lucas Marquardt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-7)(O'Malley, Joel)
November 12, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Lucas Marquardt. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(O'Malley, Joel)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #21 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Britney Jackson for Alchemy Technology Group, LLC. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 11/12/2019. (NAH)
November 12, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel D O'Malley on behalf of Alchemy Technology Group, LLC. (O'Malley, Joel)
November 8, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Briney Marie Brasher Jackson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7262377 filed by Lucas Marquardt. (O'Malley, Joel)
November 1, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Presidio Holdings Inc., Presidio Networked Solutions LLC, Presidio, Inc. re #19 Amended Notice of Hearing on Motion on attorney(s) for Defendant Alchemy Technology Group, LLC (Rashid, Faris)
November 1, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7C (STP) before Judge Donovan W. Frank. (Rashid, Faris)
October 31, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Donovan W. Frank's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these practice pointers, in addition to the District of Minnesota's Local Rules and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (las)
October 30, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Presidio, Inc., Presidio Networked Solutions LLC, Presidio Holdings Inc.. Alchemy Technology Group, LLC served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Friedman, Robert)
October 29, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Presidio, Inc., Presidio Networked Solutions LLC, Presidio Holdings Inc.. Lucas Marquardt served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Gassman-Pines, Jenny)
October 29, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel D O'Malley on behalf of Lucas Marquardt. (O'Malley, Joel)
October 28, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Monahan on behalf of Presidio Holdings Inc., Presidio Networked Solutions LLC, Presidio, Inc.. (Monahan, Thomas)
October 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert S. Friedman on behalf of Presidio Holdings Inc., Presidio Networked Solutions LLC, Presidio, Inc.. (Friedman, Robert)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robert S. Friedman for Presidio Holdings Inc., Presidio Networked Solutions LLC, and for Presidio, Inc.; granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Thomas M. Monahan for Presidio Holdings Inc., Presidio Networked Solutions LLC, and for Presidio, Inc. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 10/28/2019. (NAH)
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas M. Monahan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7232412 filed by Presidio Holdings Inc., Presidio Networked Solutions LLC, Presidio, Inc.. (Rashid, Faris)
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert S. Friedman. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7232387 filed by Presidio Holdings Inc., Presidio Networked Solutions LLC, Presidio, Inc.. (Rashid, Faris)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Robert S. Friedman and Thomas M. Monahan as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MMP)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Alchemy Technology Group, LLC, Lucas Marquardt. (MMP)
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-2778 (DWF/LIB). (MMP)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Presidio Holdings Inc., Presidio Networked Solutions LLC, Presidio, Inc..(Gassman-Pines, Jenny)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 Declaration of Jamie Anderson in Support of #3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Presidio Holdings Inc., Presidio Networked Solutions LLC, Presidio, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-D)(Gassman-Pines, Jenny)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Presidio Holdings Inc., Presidio Networked Solutions LLC, Presidio, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Gassman-Pines, Jenny)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Date and time to be determined. (Gassman-Pines, Jenny)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Presidio Holdings Inc., Presidio Networked Solutions LLC, Presidio, Inc.. (Gassman-Pines, Jenny)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Presidio Networked Solutions LLC is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Plaintiffs Presidio Holdings Inc., Presidio Networked Solutions LLC, Presidio, Inc.. AP VIII AegisHoldings, L.P. is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Plaintiffs Presidio Holdings Inc., Presidio Networked Solutions LLC, Presidio, Inc.. (Gassman-Pines, Jenny)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alchemy Technology Group, LLC, Lucas Marquardt (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7230811) filed by Presidio, Inc., Presidio Networked Solutions LLC, Presidio Holdings Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gassman-Pines, Jenny)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Presidio, Inc. et al v. Marquardt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alchemy Technology Group, LLC
Represented By: Britney Jackson
Represented By: Joel D O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas Marquardt
Represented By: Joel D O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Presidio Networked Solutions LLC
Represented By: Jenny Gassman-Pines
Represented By: Thomas M. Monahan
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Represented By: Robert S. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Presidio Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Jenny Gassman-Pines
Represented By: Thomas M. Monahan
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Represented By: Robert S. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Presidio, Inc.
Represented By: Jenny Gassman-Pines
Represented By: Thomas M. Monahan
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Represented By: Robert S. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?