Phillips v. Hennepin County District Court Clerk of Courts
Plaintiff: Lametra Phillips
Defendant: Hennepin County District Court Clerk of Courts
Case Number: 0:2019cv02801
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Paul A Magnuson
2 Judge: Becky R Thorson
3 Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 12/4/2019. Associated Cases: 0:19-cv-02786-WMW-BRT, 0:19-cv-02798-WMW-BRT, 0:19-cv-02800-WMW-BRT, 0:19-cv-02801-WMW-BRT (MSK)
November 25, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson, Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-2801 WMW/BRT. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 11/4/2019, and Judge John R. Tunheim on 11/5/2019. (MTP)
October 30, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Lametra Phillips. (JGK) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/31/2019 (KMH).
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hennepin County District Court Clerk of Courts filed by Lametra Phillips. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (JGK) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/31/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Hennepin County District Court Clerk of Courts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hennepin County District Court Clerk of Courts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lametra Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?